This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 10/12/2021 at 18:20:10 (UTC).

HERNANDO HMA LLC VS RENZULLI, JOANN

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 HERNANDO HMA LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RENZULLI, JOANN. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HITZEMANN, KURT E and HITZEMANN, KURT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HITZEMANN, KURT E

HITZEMANN, KURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERNANDO HMA LLC

Defendant

RENZULLI, JOANN

Not Classified By Court

BAYFRONT HEALTH SPRING HILL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOTANE, TROY R

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: JOANN RENZULLI - PTC 110321 AT 2:00 CRTRM B

09/20/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: JOANN RENZULLI - PTC 110321 AT 2:00 CRTRM B

SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS TO JOANN RENZULLI ~ BLANK*

09/13/2021:SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS TO JOANN RENZULLI ~ BLANK*

STATEMENT OF CLAIM 2114.35

09/13/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM 2114.35

COVER SHEET

09/13/2021:COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: JOANN RENZULLI - PTC 110321 AT 2:00 CRTRM B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number H 755340

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS TO JOANN RENZULLI ~ BLANK*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM 2114.35

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCase 272021SC002396SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAYFRONT HEALTH SPRING HILL is a litigant

Latest cases where HERNANDO HMA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lotane, Troy R