This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 11/10/2021 at 18:30:23 (UTC).

HERNANDO HMA LLC VS MORELLI, MATTHEW

Case Summary

On 10/11/2021 HERNANDO HMA LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MORELLI, MATTHEW. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HITZEMANN, KURT and HITZEMANN, KURT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HITZEMANN, KURT

HITZEMANN, KURT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERNANDO HMA LLC

Defendant

MORELLI, MATTHEW

Not Classified By Court

BAYFRONT HEALTH SPRING HILL

MORELLI, MATTHEW ANTHONY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOTANE, TROY R

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

10/11/2021:COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM $2,371.00

10/11/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM $2,371.00

SUMMONS ISSUED MATTHEW MORELLI - BLANK

10/11/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED MATTHEW MORELLI - BLANK

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: MATTHEW MORELLI - PTC 120921 AT 10:30AM CRTRM B

10/18/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: MATTHEW MORELLI - PTC 120921 AT 10:30AM CRTRM B

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON MATTHEW MORELLI (SUBST) ON 103021

11/01/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON MATTHEW MORELLI (SUBST) ON 103021

MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT PTC ON 120921 AT 10:30AM -FILED BY PL

11/03/2021:MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT PTC ON 120921 AT 10:30AM -FILED BY PL

ORDER FILED FOR ALLOWANCE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT PTC ON 120921 AT 10:30AM (PL MOTION)=GRANTED -DTD 110421

11/04/2021:ORDER FILED FOR ALLOWANCE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT PTC ON 120921 AT 10:30AM (PL MOTION)=GRANTED -DTD 110421

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FILED FOR ALLOWANCE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT PTC ON 120921 AT 10:30AM (PL MOTION)=GRANTED -DTD 110421

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT PTC ON 120921 AT 10:30AM -FILED BY PL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON MATTHEW MORELLI (SUBST) ON 103021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: MATTHEW MORELLI - PTC 120921 AT 10:30AM CRTRM B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number H 759638

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED MATTHEW MORELLI - BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM $2,371.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketCase 272021SC002600SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAYFRONT HEALTH SPRING HILL is a litigant

Latest cases where HERNANDO HMA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lotane, Troy R