This case was last updated from Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 11/13/2021 at 23:40:05 (UTC).

HERNANDO HMA LLC VS MCDOWELL, BRITTANY

Case Summary

On 09/12/2019 HERNANDO HMA LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MCDOWELL, BRITTANY. This case was filed in Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE and SCAGLIONE, DONALD E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE

SCAGLIONE, DONALD E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERNANDO HMA LLC

Defendant

MCDOWELL, BRITTANY

Not Classified By Court

BAYFRONT HEALTH BROOKSVILLE

BAYFRONT HEALTH SPRING HILL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOTANE, TROY R

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

09/12/2019:COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT/INDEBTEDNESS

09/12/2019:COMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT/INDEBTEDNESS

SUMMONS ISSUED BRITTANY MCDOWELL (BLANK)

09/12/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED BRITTANY MCDOWELL (BLANK)

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: BRITTANY MCDOWELL

09/12/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: BRITTANY MCDOWELL

REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEF FILED BY PLNTF

11/05/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEF FILED BY PLNTF

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEF FILED BY PLNTF

11/05/2019:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEF FILED BY PLNTF

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

01/03/2020:MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

01/03/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 060120 AT 9:30 ON PLNTFS MTN FOR SUMMARY FJ FILED BY PLNTF

04/01/2020:NOTICE OF HEARING ON 060120 AT 9:30 ON PLNTFS MTN FOR SUMMARY FJ FILED BY PLNTF

MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY BY COUNSEL FOR HEARING ON 060120 AT 9:30 ON PLNTFS MTN FOR SUMMARY FJ FILED BY PLNTF

04/01/2020:MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY BY COUNSEL FOR HEARING ON 060120 AT 9:30 ON PLNTFS MTN FOR SUMMARY FJ FILED BY PLNTF

ORDER FILED FOR ALLOWANCE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE BY PLNTFS COUNSEL FOR HEARING ON 060120 AT 9:30 ON PLNTFS MTN FOR SUMMARY FJ IS GRANTED DTD 052020

05/20/2020:ORDER FILED FOR ALLOWANCE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE BY PLNTFS COUNSEL FOR HEARING ON 060120 AT 9:30 ON PLNTFS MTN FOR SUMMARY FJ IS GRANTED DTD 052020

JUDGMENT FILED - SUMMARY FJ - PLNTF RECOVERS FROM DEF PRINC SUM OF $33,202.46 AND COSTS $484.35 MAKING A TOTAL AMT OF $33,686.81, ALL OF WHICH SHALL BEAR INT AT THE APPLIC STAT RATE, FOR ALL OF WHICH LET EXEC ISSUE DTD 060120

06/01/2020:JUDGMENT FILED - SUMMARY FJ - PLNTF RECOVERS FROM DEF PRINC SUM OF $33,202.46 AND COSTS $484.35 MAKING A TOTAL AMT OF $33,686.81, ALL OF WHICH SHALL BEAR INT AT THE APPLIC STAT RATE, FOR ALL OF WHICH LET EXEC ISSUE DTD 060120

COURT WORKSHEET -

06/02/2020:COURT WORKSHEET -

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT WORKSHEET -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT FILED - SUMMARY FJ - PLNTF RECOVERS FROM DEF PRINC SUM OF $33,202.46 AND COSTS $484.35 MAKING A TOTAL AMT OF $33,686.81, ALL OF WHICH SHALL BEAR INT AT THE APPLIC STAT RATE, FOR ALL OF WHICH LET EXEC ISSUE DTD 060120

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FILED FOR ALLOWANCE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE BY PLNTFS COUNSEL FOR HEARING ON 060120 AT 9:30 ON PLNTFS MTN FOR SUMMARY FJ IS GRANTED DTD 052020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY BY COUNSEL FOR HEARING ON 060120 AT 9:30 ON PLNTFS MTN FOR SUMMARY FJ FILED BY PLNTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ON 060120 AT 9:30 ON PLNTFS MTN FOR SUMMARY FJ FILED BY PLNTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEF FILED BY PLNTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEF FILED BY PLNTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: BRITTANY MCDOWELL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BRITTANY MCDOWELL (BLANK)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT/INDEBTEDNESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number H 645631

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketCase 272019CA001046CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/12/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAYFRONT HEALTH BROOKSVILLE is a litigant

Latest cases where BAYFRONT HEALTH SPRING HILL is a litigant

Latest cases where HERNANDO HMA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lotane, Troy R