This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 11/01/2021 at 16:55:53 (UTC).

HERNANDO HMA LLC VS HOLLEY, JENNIFER

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 HERNANDO HMA LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HOLLEY, JENNIFER. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HITZEMANN, KURT E and HITZEMANN, KURT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HITZEMANN, KURT E

HITZEMANN, KURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERNANDO HMA LLC

Defendant

HOLLEY, JENNIFER

Not Classified By Court

BAYFRONT HEALTH BROOKSVILLE

BAYFRONT HEALTH SPRING HILL

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

07/06/2021:COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM 3486.91

07/06/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM 3486.91

SUMMONS ISSUED TO JENNIFER HOLLEY ~ BLANK

07/06/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO JENNIFER HOLLEY ~ BLANK

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: JENNIFER HOLLEY - PTC 101121 930AM CRTRM B

07/16/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: JENNIFER HOLLEY - PTC 101121 930AM CRTRM B

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON JENNIFER HOLLEY (SUBST) 091621

09/22/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON JENNIFER HOLLEY (SUBST) 091621

MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY BY COUNSEL FOR PT ON 101121 AT 9:30 FILED BY PLNTF

10/04/2021:MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY BY COUNSEL FOR PT ON 101121 AT 9:30 FILED BY PLNTF

ORDER FILED FOR ALLOWANCE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE (PLNTF) AT PTC ON 101121 AT 9:30AM -DTD 100421

10/05/2021:ORDER FILED FOR ALLOWANCE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE (PLNTF) AT PTC ON 101121 AT 9:30AM -DTD 100421

COURT WORKSHEET - JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF BY DEFAULT

10/11/2021:COURT WORKSHEET - JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF BY DEFAULT

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

10/18/2021:AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

10/18/2021:AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

10/18/2021:MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

JUDGMENT FILED - FINAL JUDGMENT PL SHALL RECOVER FROM DEF THE PRINC SUM OF $3486.91 W/COSTS OF $380.85, LESS PAYMENT OF $214.88, FOR A TOTAL SUM OF $3652.88 ALL OF WHICH SHALL BEAR INTEREST AT THE STAT RATE, FOR ALL OF WHICH LET EXECUTION ISSUE -DTD

10/21/2021:JUDGMENT FILED - FINAL JUDGMENT PL SHALL RECOVER FROM DEF THE PRINC SUM OF $3486.91 W/COSTS OF $380.85, LESS PAYMENT OF $214.88, FOR A TOTAL SUM OF $3652.88 ALL OF WHICH SHALL BEAR INTEREST AT THE STAT RATE, FOR ALL OF WHICH LET EXECUTION ISSUE -DTD 102121

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT FILED - FINAL JUDGMENT PL SHALL RECOVER FROM DEF THE PRINC SUM OF $3486.91 W/COSTS OF $380.85, LESS PAYMENT OF $214.88, FOR A TOTAL SUM OF $3652.88 ALL OF WHICH SHALL BEAR INTEREST AT THE STAT RATE, FOR ALL OF WHICH LET EXECUTION ISSUE -DTD 102121

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT WORKSHEET - JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF BY DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FILED FOR ALLOWANCE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE (PLNTF) AT PTC ON 101121 AT 9:30AM -DTD 100421

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY BY COUNSEL FOR PT ON 101121 AT 9:30 FILED BY PLNTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON JENNIFER HOLLEY (SUBST) 091621

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: JENNIFER HOLLEY - PTC 101121 930AM CRTRM B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number H 745772

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO JENNIFER HOLLEY ~ BLANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM 3486.91

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCase 272021SC001757SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/6/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAYFRONT HEALTH BROOKSVILLE is a litigant

Latest cases where BAYFRONT HEALTH SPRING HILL is a litigant

Latest cases where HERNANDO HMA, LLC is a litigant