This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 10/12/2021 at 18:19:37 (UTC).

HERNANDO HMA LLC VS HECKE, RICHARD J

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 HERNANDO HMA LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HECKE, RICHARD J. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEALIS, KRISTIE MARIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEALIS, KRISTIE MARIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERNANDO HMA LLC

Defendant

HECKE, RICHARD J

Not Classified By Court

BAYFRONT HEALTH SPRING HILL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOTANE, TROY R

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: RICHARD J HECKE - PTC 110821 AT 11:45 CRTRM C

09/20/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: RICHARD J HECKE - PTC 110821 AT 11:45 CRTRM C

SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS TO RICHARD J HECKE ~ BLANK*

09/13/2021:SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS TO RICHARD J HECKE ~ BLANK*

STATEMENT OF CLAIM 5972.42

09/13/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM 5972.42

COVER SHEET

09/13/2021:COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: RICHARD J HECKE - PTC 110821 AT 11:45 CRTRM C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number H 755329

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS TO RICHARD J HECKE ~ BLANK*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM 5972.42

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCase 272021SC002391SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAYFRONT HEALTH SPRING HILL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lotane, Troy R