This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 12/23/2021 at 18:45:23 (UTC).

HERNANDO HMA LLC VS GREENE, BRANDON S

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 HERNANDO HMA LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GREENE, BRANDON S. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HITZEMANN, KURT E and HITZEMANN, KURT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HITZEMANN, KURT E

HITZEMANN, KURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERNANDO HMA LLC

Defendant

GREENE, BRANDON S

Not Classified By Court

BAYFRONT HEALTH SPRING HILL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOTANE, TROY R

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

11/23/2021:COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM 992.00

11/23/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM 992.00

SUMMONS ISSUED TO BRANDON S GREENE ~ BLANK

11/23/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO BRANDON S GREENE ~ BLANK

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: BRANDON S GREENE - PTC 020222 AT 9:00 CRTRM B

12/06/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: BRANDON S GREENE - PTC 020222 AT 9:00 CRTRM B

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON BRANDON S GREENE 120921

12/10/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON BRANDON S GREENE 120921

AGREEMENT - DEF IS INDEBTED TO PL IN THE PRINC SUM OF $992.00, COURT COSTS OF $241.48, FOR A TOTAL CLAIM OF $1233.48 DEF TO PAY $60 BY 121321 AND BY THE 13TH OF EACH MONTH THEREAFTER

12/14/2021:AGREEMENT - DEF IS INDEBTED TO PL IN THE PRINC SUM OF $992.00, COURT COSTS OF $241.48, FOR A TOTAL CLAIM OF $1233.48 DEF TO PAY $60 BY 121321 AND BY THE 13TH OF EACH MONTH THEREAFTER

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAGREEMENT - DEF IS INDEBTED TO PL IN THE PRINC SUM OF $992.00, COURT COSTS OF $241.48, FOR A TOTAL CLAIM OF $1233.48 DEF TO PAY $60 BY 121321 AND BY THE 13TH OF EACH MONTH THEREAFTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON BRANDON S GREENE 120921

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: BRANDON S GREENE - PTC 020222 AT 9:00 CRTRM B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number H 766425

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO BRANDON S GREENE ~ BLANK*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM 992.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCase 272021SC002926SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAYFRONT HEALTH SPRING HILL is a litigant

Latest cases where HERNANDO HMA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lotane, Troy R