This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 11/10/2021 at 18:31:16 (UTC).

HERNANDO HMA LLC VS FULGENZI, BRANDON S

Case Summary

On 10/11/2021 HERNANDO HMA LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FULGENZI, BRANDON S. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEALIS, KRISTIE MARIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEALIS, KRISTIE MARIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERNANDO HMA LLC

Defendant

FULGENZI, BRANDON S

Not Classified By Court

BAYFRONT HEALTH SPRING HILL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOTANE, TROY R

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

10/11/2021:COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM $1,004.00

10/11/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM $1,004.00

SUMMONS ISSUED BRANDON S FULGENZI - BLANK

10/11/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED BRANDON S FULGENZI - BLANK

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: BRANDON FULGENZI - PTC 121521 AT 11AM CRTRM C

10/18/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: BRANDON FULGENZI - PTC 121521 AT 11AM CRTRM C

CHANGE OF ADDRESS FORM FILED BY DFNDT BRANDON FULGENZI

10/22/2021:CHANGE OF ADDRESS FORM FILED BY DFNDT BRANDON FULGENZI

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON BRANDON S FULGENZI 102921

11/01/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON BRANDON S FULGENZI 102921

MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT PTC ON 121521 AT 11AM -FILED BY PL

11/03/2021:MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT PTC ON 121521 AT 11AM -FILED BY PL

ORDER FILED FOR ALLOWANCE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT PTC ON 121521 AT 11AM (PL MOTION)=GRANTED -DTD 110421

11/04/2021:ORDER FILED FOR ALLOWANCE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT PTC ON 121521 AT 11AM (PL MOTION)=GRANTED -DTD 110421

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FILED FOR ALLOWANCE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT PTC ON 121521 AT 11AM (PL MOTION)=GRANTED -DTD 110421

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT PTC ON 121521 AT 11AM -FILED BY PL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON BRANDON S FULGENZI 102921

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCHANGE OF ADDRESS FORM FILED BY DFNDT BRANDON FULGENZI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: BRANDON FULGENZI - PTC 121521 AT 11AM CRTRM C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number H 759651

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BRANDON S FULGENZI - BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM $1,004.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketCase 272021SC002603SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAYFRONT HEALTH SPRING HILL is a litigant

Latest cases where HERNANDO HMA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lotane, Troy R