This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 11/10/2021 at 18:28:54 (UTC).

HERNANDO HMA LLC DBA BAYFRONT VS POPE, CLEVELAND JR

Case Summary

On 10/11/2021 HERNANDO HMA LLC DBA BAYFRONT filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against POPE, CLEVELAND JR. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEALIS, KRISTIE MARIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEALIS, KRISTIE MARIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERNANDO HMA LLC DBA BAYFRONT

Defendant

POPE, CLEVELAND JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOTANE, TROY R

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

10/11/2021:COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM $2,786.52

10/11/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM $2,786.52

SUMMONS ISSUED CLEVELAND POPE - BLANK

10/11/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED CLEVELAND POPE - BLANK

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CLEVELAND POPE - PTC 121521 AT 11AM CRTRM C

10/18/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CLEVELAND POPE - PTC 121521 AT 11AM CRTRM C

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON CLEVELAND POPE 102021

10/20/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON CLEVELAND POPE 102021

MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT PTC ON 121521 AT 11AM -FILED BY PL

10/22/2021:MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT PTC ON 121521 AT 11AM -FILED BY PL

ORDER FILED FOR ALLOWANCE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE (PL) ON 121521 AT 11AM=GRANTED DEF TO APPEAR IN PERSON -DTD 102521

10/25/2021:ORDER FILED FOR ALLOWANCE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE (PL) ON 121521 AT 11AM=GRANTED DEF TO APPEAR IN PERSON -DTD 102521

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FILED FOR ALLOWANCE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE (PL) ON 121521 AT 11AM=GRANTED DEF TO APPEAR IN PERSON -DTD 102521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT PTC ON 121521 AT 11AM -FILED BY PL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON CLEVELAND POPE 102021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CLEVELAND POPE - PTC 121521 AT 11AM CRTRM C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number H 759561

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED CLEVELAND POPE - BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM $2,786.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketCase 272021SC002593SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HERNANDO HMA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lotane, Troy R