This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 10/21/2020 at 18:19:59 (UTC).

HERNANDO HMA LLC DBA BAYFRONT VS LASANTA, THERESA KELLISH

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 HERNANDO HMA LLC DBA BAYFRONT filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LASANTA, THERESA KELLISH. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HITZEMANN, KURT and HITZEMANN, KURT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HITZEMANN, KURT

HITZEMANN, KURT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HERNANDO HMA LLC DBA BAYFRONT

HERNANDO HMA LLC

Defendant

LASANTA, THERESA KELLISH

Not Classified By Court

BAYFRONT HEALTH BROOKSVILLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CLINTON, J PAUL

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: THERESA LASANTA - PTC 111620 AT 9:00 CRTRM B

09/25/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: THERESA LASANTA - PTC 111620 AT 9:00 CRTRM B

STATEMENT OF CLAIM $2,735.54

09/21/2020:STATEMENT OF CLAIM $2,735.54

AFFIDAVIT OF ACCOUNT

09/21/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF ACCOUNT

SUMMONS ISSUED THERESA LASANTA - BLANK

09/21/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED THERESA LASANTA - BLANK

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS karen@stokesandclinton.com

09/21/2020:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS karen@stokesandclinton.com

COVER SHEET

09/21/2020:COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: THERESA LASANTA - PTC 111620 AT 9:00 CRTRM B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number H 699645

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM $2,735.54

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED THERESA LASANTA - BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS karen@stokesandclinton.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF ACCOUNT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCase 272020SC001918SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less