This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 11/01/2021 at 17:06:22 (UTC).

HERNANDO HMA LLC DBA BAYFRONT VS HUGHES, KATHLEEN

Case Summary

On 07/12/2021 HERNANDO HMA LLC DBA BAYFRONT filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HUGHES, KATHLEEN. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEALIS, KRISTIE MARIE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEALIS, KRISTIE MARIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERNANDO HMA LLC DBA BAYFRONT

Defendant

HUGHES, KATHLEEN

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

07/12/2021:COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM 974.00

07/12/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM 974.00

SUMMONS ISSUED TO KATHLEEN HUGHES ~ BLANK

07/12/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO KATHLEEN HUGHES ~ BLANK

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: KATHLEEN HUGHES - PTC 092221 11AM CRTRM C

07/16/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: KATHLEEN HUGHES - PTC 092221 11AM CRTRM C

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED TO KATHLEEN HUGHES (SUBST) ON 082321 - PTC 092221 AT 11AM CRTRM C

09/03/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED TO KATHLEEN HUGHES (SUBST) ON 082321 - PTC 092221 AT 11AM CRTRM C

MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FOR PTC ON 092221 AT 11AM -FILED BY PL

09/13/2021:MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FOR PTC ON 092221 AT 11AM -FILED BY PL

ORDER FILED FOR ALLOWANCE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE (PLNTF) ON 092221 AT 11AM=GRANTED -DTD 091421

09/14/2021:ORDER FILED FOR ALLOWANCE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE (PLNTF) ON 092221 AT 11AM=GRANTED -DTD 091421

COURT WORKSHEET - JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF BY DEFAULT

09/22/2021:COURT WORKSHEET - JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF BY DEFAULT

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

09/24/2021:AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

09/24/2021:AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT AND PROPER VENUE

09/24/2021:MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT AND PROPER VENUE

JUDGMENT FILED - PLNTF RECOVER FROM DEF PRINC $974.00 AND COSTS $251.48 MAKING A TOTAL SUM OF $1225.48 ALL OF WHICH SHALL BEAR INT AT THE APPLIC STAT RATE FOR ALL OF WHICH LET EXECUTION ISSUE DTD 092921

09/29/2021:JUDGMENT FILED - PLNTF RECOVER FROM DEF PRINC $974.00 AND COSTS $251.48 MAKING A TOTAL SUM OF $1225.48 ALL OF WHICH SHALL BEAR INT AT THE APPLIC STAT RATE FOR ALL OF WHICH LET EXECUTION ISSUE DTD 092921

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT FILED - PLNTF RECOVER FROM DEF PRINC $974.00 AND COSTS $251.48 MAKING A TOTAL SUM OF $1225.48 ALL OF WHICH SHALL BEAR INT AT THE APPLIC STAT RATE FOR ALL OF WHICH LET EXECUTION ISSUE DTD 092921

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT AND PROPER VENUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT WORKSHEET - JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF BY DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FILED FOR ALLOWANCE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE (PLNTF) ON 092221 AT 11AM=GRANTED -DTD 091421

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FOR PTC ON 092221 AT 11AM -FILED BY PL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED TO KATHLEEN HUGHES (SUBST) ON 082321 - PTC 092221 AT 11AM CRTRM C

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: KATHLEEN HUGHES - PTC 092221 11AM CRTRM C

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number H 746198

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO KATHLEEN HUGHES ~ BLANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM 974.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCase 272021SC001794SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/12/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HERNANDO HMA, LLC is a litigant