This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 12/10/2021 at 18:20:41 (UTC).

HERNANDO HMA LLC DBA BAYFRONT VS FLANNERY, BRITNEY

Case Summary

On 11/10/2021 HERNANDO HMA LLC DBA BAYFRONT filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FLANNERY, BRITNEY. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HITZEMANN, KURT E and HITZEMANN, KURT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HITZEMANN, KURT E

HITZEMANN, KURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HERNANDO HMA LLC DBA BAYFRONT

HERNANDO HMA LLC

Defendant

FLANNERY, BRITNEY

Not Classified By Court

DBA BAYFRONT HEALTH SPRING HIL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOTANE, TROY R

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

11/10/2021:COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $5422.97

11/10/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $5422.97

SUMMONS ISSUED TO BRITNEY FLANNERY (BLANK)

11/10/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO BRITNEY FLANNERY (BLANK)

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: BRITNEY FLANNERY - PTC 011422 AT 9AM CRTRM B

11/17/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: BRITNEY FLANNERY - PTC 011422 AT 9AM CRTRM B

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON BRITNEY FLANNERY 112921

11/30/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON BRITNEY FLANNERY 112921

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON BRITNEY FLANNERY 112921

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: BRITNEY FLANNERY - PTC 011422 AT 9AM CRTRM B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number H 764386

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO BRITNEY FLANNERY (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - $5422.97

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketCase 272021SC002847SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAYFRONT HEALTH SPRING HILL is a litigant

Latest cases where HERNANDO HMA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lotane, Troy R