This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 10/21/2020 at 18:18:07 (UTC).

HERNANDO HMA LLC DBA BAYFRONT VS DESHONG, KIMBERLY MICHELE

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 HERNANDO HMA LLC DBA BAYFRONT filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DESHONG, KIMBERLY MICHELE. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEALIS, KRISTIE MARIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEALIS, KRISTIE MARIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HERNANDO HMA LLC DBA BAYFRONT

HERNANDO HMA LLC

Defendant

DESHONG, KIMBERLY MICHELE

Not Classified By Court

BAYFRONT HEALTH SPRING HILL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CLINTON, J PAUL

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: KIMBERLY DESHONG - PTC 111220 AT 11:30 CRTRM C

10/02/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: KIMBERLY DESHONG - PTC 111220 AT 11:30 CRTRM C

AFFIDAVIT OF ACCOUNT

09/21/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF ACCOUNT

STATEMENT OF CLAIM $1,400.70

09/21/2020:STATEMENT OF CLAIM $1,400.70

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR KIMBERLY DESHONG - BLANK

09/21/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR KIMBERLY DESHONG - BLANK

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS karen@stokesandclinton.com

09/21/2020:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS karen@stokesandclinton.com

COVER SHEET

09/21/2020:COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: KIMBERLY DESHONG - PTC 111220 AT 11:30 CRTRM C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number H 699649

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM $1,400.70

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR KIMBERLY DESHONG - BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS karen@stokesandclinton.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF ACCOUNT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCase 272020SC001919SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less