Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County on 03/24/2021 at 17:27:27 (UTC).

HERNANDO COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFIC VS DELEON, MIGUEL Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 HERNANDO COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFIC filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against DELEON, MIGUEL. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE and SCAGLIONE, DONALD E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE

SCAGLIONE, DONALD E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERNANDO COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFIC

Defendants

DELEON, MIGUEL

SCHULTZ, ANDREW

PATEL, HERSHADKUMAR

MARSHALL, JENNI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRITTON, JOEL D

 

Court Documents

ADMINISTRATITVE NOTICE

02/25/2021:ADMINISTRATITVE NOTICE

DOCUMENTS FILED - AMENDMENT: 10

02/25/2021:DOCUMENTS FILED - AMENDMENT: 10

ADMIN ORDER A-2020-12-I DTD 092220

02/25/2021:ADMIN ORDER A-2020-12-I DTD 092220

SUPREME COURT OF FLORIDA ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO AOSC20-23

02/25/2021:SUPREME COURT OF FLORIDA ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO AOSC20-23

MEMORANDUM

02/25/2021:MEMORANDUM

COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE

02/22/2021:COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE

COVER SHEET

02/22/2021:COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: ANDREW SCHULTZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: HARSHADKUMAR PATEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: JENNI MARSHALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: MIGUEL DELEON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR ANDREW SCHULTZ (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR HARSHADKUMAR PATEL (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR JENNI MARSHALL (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR MIGUEL DELEON (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF - POSTING $1500.00 BOND FOR FORFEITURE OF CONTRABAND W/ THE CLERK OF THE COURT FILED BY HCSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMINISTRATITVE NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMIN ORDER A-2020-12-I DTD 092220

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPREME COURT OF FLORIDA ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO AOSC20-23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $2,541.00 Receipt Number H 722293

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $2,541.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $2,541.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CA000132CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HERNANDO COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFIC is a litigant