Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 05/01/2021 at 19:30:51 (UTC).

HENSLEY, SHAWN VS PERRAULT, ELISABETH

Case Summary

On 04/01/2021 HENSLEY, SHAWN filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against PERRAULT, ELISABETH. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EINEMAN, THOMAS RALPH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EINEMAN, THOMAS RALPH

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HENSLEY, SHAWN

Respondent

PERRAULT, ELISABETH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DAY, DAVID JEFFREY

Respondent Attorney

BROOMFIELD, LAKIA MICHELLE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE LAKI BROOMFIELD OBO ELISABETH PERRAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR TEMPORARY RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT FOR SHAWN HENSLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY (UCCJEA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE DAVID DAY ESQ OBO SHAWN HENSLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF - OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER W/CHILDREN FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR CIVIL INDIGENCY - INDIGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: ELISABETH PERRAULT SIGNED AND SEALED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCIVIL AFF/APP FOR INDIG STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCIVIL AFF/APP FOR INDIG STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR PATERNITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCase 272021DR000655DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/1/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROOMFIELD, LAKIA