Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 05/14/2021 at 21:37:48 (UTC).

HEATH, KEVIN, MCADOO, DOLORES Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 HEATH, KEVIN, MCADOO, DOLORES was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBEE, DON JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARBEE, DON JR

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HEATH, KEVIN

Claimant

ASCENSIONPOINT RECOVERY SERVIC

Decedent

MCADOO, DOLORES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DAY, DAVID JEFFREY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM WAS EMAILED TO THE ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketEstate Claim for $2,361.21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - ASCENSIONPOINT RECOVERY SERVICES LLC OBO CITIBANK $2,361.21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM CITIBANK NA - SEARS CHARGE PLUS CARD $2,361.21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketORDER ADMIT WILL TO PROBATE DTD 04/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY DTD 04/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketORDER FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION DTD 04/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH OF DOLORES MARIE MCADOO A/K/A DELORES M. MCADOO ORG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketNOTICE: CONSOLIDATION PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketJOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF FORMAL NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $235.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CP000525CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF DOLORES M MCADOO (ORIGINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketDEPOSIT/RECEIPT OF WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CP000392CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAY, DAVID JEFFREY