This case was last updated from Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 07/06/2022 at 16:31:21 (UTC).

HARTSFIELD, STEPHEN VS CRYSTAL MOTORSPORTS LLC D B A

Case Summary

On 06/06/2022 HARTSFIELD, STEPHEN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CRYSTAL MOTORSPORTS LLC D B A. This case was filed in Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE and SCAGLIONE, DONALD E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE

SCAGLIONE, DONALD E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARTSFIELD, STEPHEN

Defendant

CRYSTAL MOTORSPORTS LLC D B A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VIANNA, MISTY MORGAN

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

06/06/2022:COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

06/06/2022:COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

SUMMONS ISSUED TO CRYSTAL MOTORSPORTS LLC DBA CRYSTAL SUPERCENTER ~ BLANK

06/06/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO CRYSTAL MOTORSPORTS LLC DBA CRYSTAL SUPERCENTER ~ BLANK

REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DFDNT

06/06/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DFDNT

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DFDNT

06/06/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DFDNT

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

06/06/2022:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CRYSTAL MOTORSPORTS LLC DBA CRYSTAL SUPERCENTER

06/08/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CRYSTAL MOTORSPORTS LLC DBA CRYSTAL SUPERCENTER

ADMINISTRATIVE NOTICE (AMENDED)

06/13/2022:ADMINISTRATIVE NOTICE (AMENDED)

SCHEDULING/HEARING MEMORANDUM DTD 060622

06/13/2022:SCHEDULING/HEARING MEMORANDUM DTD 060622

SERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS ON CRYSTAL MOTORSPORTS LLC DBA CRYSTAL SUPERCENTER 062022

06/22/2022:SERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS ON CRYSTAL MOTORSPORTS LLC DBA CRYSTAL SUPERCENTER 062022

INTERROGATORIES TO DFDNT

06/06/2022:INTERROGATORIES TO DFDNT

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS ON CRYSTAL MOTORSPORTS LLC DBA CRYSTAL SUPERCENTER 062022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSCHEDULING/HEARING MEMORANDUM DTD 060622

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMINISTRATIVE NOTICE (AMENDED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketHIGH PRIORITY NOTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CRYSTAL MOTORSPORTS LLC DBA CRYSTAL SUPERCENTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number H 796592

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DFDNT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DFDNT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES TO DFDNT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO CRYSTAL MOTORSPORTS LLC DBA CRYSTAL SUPERCENTER ~ BLANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketCase 272022CA000543CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/6/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer VIANNA , MISTY MORGAN