This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County on 09/01/2021 at 16:20:06 (UTC).

HANEY, STEVEN Et Al VS DBA FOUR SEASONS DESIGN & REMO Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/02/2021 HANEY, STEVEN filed an Other lawsuit against DBA FOUR SEASONS DESIGN REMO. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HANEY, STEVEN

HANEY, WENDY

Defendants

FLORIDA SUNROOMS INC

DBA FOUR SEASONS DESIGN & REMO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SNOW, ROBERT BRUCE

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF TRANSFER

08/02/2021:CERTIFICATE OF TRANSFER

DOCUMENTS FILED - COPY OF CLAIM OF LIEN

08/02/2021:DOCUMENTS FILED - COPY OF CLAIM OF LIEN

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketSERVICE - CERT MAIL RET SERVED TO RAY BABCOCK PRESIDENT FLORIDA SUNROOM INC DBA SEASONS DESIGN & REMODELING CENTER 082021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $94,136.70 Receipt Number H 749135

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $94,136.70 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $94,136.70

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF TRANSFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCUMENTS FILED - COPY OF CLAIM OF LIEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CA000608CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/2/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SNOW, ROBERT BRUCE