This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County on 11/01/2021 at 10:58:07 (UTC).

HAMPTON, KETORIA VS TOMAYO, JOSE M Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/20/2020 HAMPTON, KETORIA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against TOMAYO, JOSE M. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ANGELIADIS, GEORGE GREGORY and ANGELIADIS, GEORGE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ANGELIADIS, GEORGE GREGORY

ANGELIADIS, GEORGE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HAMPTON, KETORIA

Defendants

YAI AND SAI FLOORING INC

TOMAYO, JOSE M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAW, MEGAN ELIZABETH

Defendant Attorney

STAVROU, ALEX REED

 

Court Documents

SERVICE - CERT MAIL RET SERVED TO HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY CLERK OF COURT

02/09/2021:SERVICE - CERT MAIL RET SERVED TO HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY CLERK OF COURT

ORDER FILED ON PLNTFS MTN TO TRANSFER VENUE TO HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY IS GRANTED DTD 101920

10/19/2020:ORDER FILED ON PLNTFS MTN TO TRANSFER VENUE TO HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY IS GRANTED DTD 101920

STIPULATION FILED TO TRANSFER VENUE TO HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY FLORIDA

10/12/2020:STIPULATION FILED TO TRANSFER VENUE TO HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY FLORIDA

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME OF ALEX R STAVROU ESQ AS COUNSEL FOR DEFS AND MTN FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING

07/17/2020:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME OF ALEX R STAVROU ESQ AS COUNSEL FOR DEFS AND MTN FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: YAI & SAI FLOORING INC C/O JESUS GOMEZ LEIVA, REGISTERED AGENT

03/24/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: YAI & SAI FLOORING INC C/O JESUS GOMEZ LEIVA, REGISTERED AGENT

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: JOSE M ALVAREZ TAMAYO

03/24/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: JOSE M ALVAREZ TAMAYO

SUMMONS ISSUED TO YAI & SAID FLOORING INC C/O JESUS GOMEZ LEIVA, REGISTERED AGENT ~ BLANK

03/20/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED TO YAI & SAID FLOORING INC C/O JESUS GOMEZ LEIVA, REGISTERED AGENT ~ BLANK

SUMMONS ISSUED TO JOSE M ALVAREZ TAMAYO ~ BLANK

03/20/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED TO JOSE M ALVAREZ TAMAYO ~ BLANK

INTERROGATORY - NOTICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

03/20/2020:INTERROGATORY - NOTICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

INTERROGATORY - NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

03/20/2020:INTERROGATORY - NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

REQUEST TO PRODUCE - PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, YAI & SAI FLOORING, INC.

03/20/2020:REQUEST TO PRODUCE - PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, YAI & SAI FLOORING, INC.

REQUEST TO PRODUCE - PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT JOSE M ALVAREZ TAMAYO

03/20/2020:REQUEST TO PRODUCE - PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT JOSE M ALVAREZ TAMAYO

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

03/20/2020:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS - PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQEUST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

03/20/2020:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS - PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQEUST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

COMPLAINT FOR AUTO NEGLIGENCE

03/20/2020:COMPLAINT FOR AUTO NEGLIGENCE

COVER SHEET

03/20/2020:COVER SHEET

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE - CERT MAIL RET SERVED TO HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY CLERK OF COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FILED ON PLNTFS MTN TO TRANSFER VENUE TO HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY IS GRANTED DTD 101920

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION FILED TO TRANSFER VENUE TO HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME OF ALEX R STAVROU ESQ AS COUNSEL FOR DEFS AND MTN FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: YAI & SAI FLOORING INC C/O JESUS GOMEZ LEIVA, REGISTERED AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: JOSE M ALVAREZ TAMAYO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $420.00 Receipt Number H 676140

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $420.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTERROGATORY - NOTICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTERROGATORY - NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE - PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, YAI & SAI FLOORING, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE - PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT JOSE M ALVAREZ TAMAYO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS - PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQEUST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR AUTO NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketCase 272020CA000300CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEGAN SHAW