This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 10/01/2021 at 21:09:05 (UTC).

HALE, KEVIN M, HALE, PATRICIA LORRAINE Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/01/2021 HALE, KEVIN M, HALE, PATRICIA LORRAINE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBEE, DON JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARBEE, DON JR

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HALE, KEVIN M

Decedent

HALE, PATRICIA LORRAINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SNOW, ROBERT BRUCE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketCOPY REQUEST COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $4.00 Receipt Number H 753730

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $4.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $345.00 Receipt Number H 753585

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $345.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH PATRICIA LORRAINE HALE (E-PORTAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CP001143CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/1/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SNOW, ROBERT BRUCE