Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 03/26/2021 at 19:32:13 (UTC).

GUNTNER, LINDSAY VS FREIRE, RAYMOND

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 GUNTNER, LINDSAY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against FREIRE, RAYMOND. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EINEMAN, THOMAS RALPH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EINEMAN, THOMAS RALPH

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GUNTNER, LINDSAY

Respondent

FREIRE, RAYMOND

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketNOTICE THAT SCHEDULED HEARING WILL BE HELD VIA ZOOM VIDEOCONFERENCING 04/01/2021 AT 11:00 A.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING DL OF LINDSAY CAROL GUNTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF - OF HEARING 04/01/2021 AT 11:00 A.M. VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketORDER FILED OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - WIFE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF RESIDENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - HUSBAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketRULES OF COURTROOM CIVILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE SCHEDULG MEETING W/SELF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketSTANDING FMAILY LAW COURT ORDER W/O CHILDREN FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $408.00 Receipt Number H 722792

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $408.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCase 272021DR000368DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/1/2021

    Read MoreRead Less