Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 03/26/2021 at 19:33:30 (UTC).

GUNNOE, SAMUEL LEE III VS MANN, HOPE TERESA

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 GUNNOE, SAMUEL LEE III filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MANN, HOPE TERESA. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EINEMAN, THOMAS RALPH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EINEMAN, THOMAS RALPH

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GUNNOE, SAMUEL LEE III

Respondent

MANN, HOPE TERESA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CAVANAUGH, KELLY ANN

Respondent Attorney

SMITH, SCOTT TIMOTHY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF - HEARING USING ZOOM CONFERENCING ON 03/31/21 AT 10:45 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketNOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR TEMPORARY RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketANSWER TO PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF SCOTT SMITH OBO WIFE/RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT -HUSBAND'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY LAW ORDER INVOLVING PARENTING ISSUES WITH ATTACHMENTS EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY (UCCJEA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ATTORNEY KELLY CAVANAUGH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $418.00 Receipt Number H 722923

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $418.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $418.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCase 272021DR000375DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/1/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CAVANAUGH, KELLY ANN