This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County on 12/19/2019 at 16:17:24 (UTC).

GRIZZARD, EILEEN VS MCGEEHAN, MARGARET Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 GRIZZARD, EILEEN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MCGEEHAN, MARGARET. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRIZZARD, EILEEN

Defendants

MCGEEHAN, MARGARET

VERES INSURANCE AGENCY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

DOLLARD, JASON PHILLIP

STEWART, ALAN DAVID

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF FILING PRIVILEGE LOG IN RESPONSE TO PLNTFS REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEF, MARGARET MCGEEHAN

02/25/2020:NOTICE OF FILING PRIVILEGE LOG IN RESPONSE TO PLNTFS REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEF, MARGARET MCGEEHAN

REQUEST FOR COPIES TO CO-DEF, VERES INSURANCE AGENCY INC (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEF, MARGARET MCGEEHAN

04/16/2020:REQUEST FOR COPIES TO CO-DEF, VERES INSURANCE AGENCY INC (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEF, MARGARET MCGEEHAN

NOTICE OF - SUBST OF COUNSEL W/I THE SAME FIRM - DONNA ZMIJEWSKI ESQ AS COUNSEL FOR DEF, VERES INSURANCE AGENCY INC IN PLACE OF ALAN D STEWART INC

04/07/2020:NOTICE OF - SUBST OF COUNSEL W/I THE SAME FIRM - DONNA ZMIJEWSKI ESQ AS COUNSEL FOR DEF, VERES INSURANCE AGENCY INC IN PLACE OF ALAN D STEWART INC

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY

04/15/2020:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLNTFS DISCOVERY REQUESTS FILED BY DEF, MARGARET MCGEEHAN

01/31/2020:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLNTFS DISCOVERY REQUESTS FILED BY DEF, MARGARET MCGEEHAN

NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF, MARGARET MCGEEHAN

01/02/2020:NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF, MARGARET MCGEEHAN

SUPPLEMENTAL - RESPONSE TO PLNTFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION FILED BY DEF, VERES INSURANCE AGENCY INC

04/14/2020:SUPPLEMENTAL - RESPONSE TO PLNTFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION FILED BY DEF, VERES INSURANCE AGENCY INC

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD AND PRIVILEGE LOG FILED BY DEF, VERES INSURANCE AGENCY INC

04/13/2020:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD AND PRIVILEGE LOG FILED BY DEF, VERES INSURANCE AGENCY INC

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF EILEEN GRIZZARD ON 080420 FILED BY DEF, VERES INSURANCE AGENCY INC

07/30/2020:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF EILEEN GRIZZARD ON 080420 FILED BY DEF, VERES INSURANCE AGENCY INC

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF EILEEN GRIZZARD ON 080420 AT 10:00 FILED BY DEF, VERES INSURANCE AGENCY INC

05/11/2020:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF EILEEN GRIZZARD ON 080420 AT 10:00 FILED BY DEF, VERES INSURANCE AGENCY INC

REQUEST FOR COPIES OBTAINED PURSUANT TO RULE 1.351 FLA.R.CIV.P TO CO-DEF, VERES INSURANCE AGENCY INC FILED BY DEF, MARGARET MCGEEHAN

04/27/2020:REQUEST FOR COPIES OBTAINED PURSUANT TO RULE 1.351 FLA.R.CIV.P TO CO-DEF, VERES INSURANCE AGENCY INC FILED BY DEF, MARGARET MCGEEHAN

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEF

04/27/2020:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEF

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON MARGARET MCGEEHAN (SUBST SERVED TO CONNEL MCGEEHAN) 121719

12/23/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON MARGARET MCGEEHAN (SUBST SERVED TO CONNEL MCGEEHAN) 121719

ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY VERES INSURANCE AGENCY INC

12/26/2019:ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY VERES INSURANCE AGENCY INC

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON VERES INSURANCE AGENCY INC, A FLORIDA PROFIT CORPORATION 120619

12/23/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON VERES INSURANCE AGENCY INC, A FLORIDA PROFIT CORPORATION 120619

ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY MARGARET MCGEEHAN

01/02/2020:ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY MARGARET MCGEEHAN

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF FRANK A MILLER ESQ ON BEHALF OF DEF, MARGARET MCGEEHAN

12/30/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF FRANK A MILLER ESQ ON BEHALF OF DEF, MARGARET MCGEEHAN

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF ALAND D STEWART ESQ FROM 121319 THROUGH AND INCLUDING 010320

12/12/2019:NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF ALAND D STEWART ESQ FROM 121319 THROUGH AND INCLUDING 010320

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF ALAND D STEWART ESQ FROM 121319 THROUGH AND INCLUDING 010320

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC (FIRST) TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF, VERES INSURANCE AGENCY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF, VERES INSURANCE AGENCY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF ALAN D STEWART ESQ AS COUNSEL FOR DEF, VERES INSURANCE AGENCY INC AND DESIG OF EMAIL ADDRESS LawOfficesWeissman@thehartford.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: VERES INSURANCE AGENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: MARGARET MCGEEHAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $420.00 Receipt Number H 657430

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $420.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO VERES INSURANCE AGENCY, INC ~ BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO MARGARET MCGEEHAN ~ BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, MARGARET MCGEEHAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, VERES INSURANCE AGENCY, IN A FLORIDA PROFIT CORPORATON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTERROGATORY NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, VERES INSURANCE AGENCY, IN A FLORIDA PROFIT CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTERROGATORY NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, MARGARET MCGGEHAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS eservice@schwedlawfirm.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketCase 272019CA001334CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason P Dollard

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stewart, Alan D