This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 07/13/2020 at 13:09:24 (UTC).

GRIFFIN, NICOLE MICHELLE VS GRIFFIN, JASON JAMES

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 GRIFFIN, NICOLE MICHELLE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GRIFFIN, JASON JAMES. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are EINEMAN, THOMAS R and EINEMAN, THOMAS RALPH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

EINEMAN, THOMAS R

EINEMAN, THOMAS RALPH

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GRIFFIN, NICOLE MICHELLE

Respondent

GRIFFIN, JASON JAMES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT DISS MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketDOCUMENTS FILED - REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF - LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE FOR TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketORDER FILED SETTING TRIAL 3/3/2020 @ 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketORDER FILED OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketNOTICE SCHEDULG MEETING W/SELF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF CORROBORATING WITNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketVITAL STATISTICS FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: JASON JAMES GRIFFIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketDRIVERS LICENSE COPY - PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER - PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketDEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $408.00 Receipt Number H 658994

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $408.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase 272019DR002440DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/6/2019

    Read MoreRead Less