Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 03/26/2021 at 19:36:08 (UTC).

GREEN, MARY VS GREEN, THOMAS L JR

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 GREEN, MARY filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against GREEN, THOMAS L JR. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are VERGARA, PAMELA STINNETTE and PAMELA VERGARA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

VERGARA, PAMELA STINNETTE

PAMELA VERGARA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GREEN, MARY

Respondent

GREEN, THOMAS L JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BURGOS, SALLY DIANE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE SALLY D. BURGOS OBO PETITIONER AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL (SIGNED NOTICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF SALLY BURGOS OBO PETITIONER (UNSIGNED NOTICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT - DOM VIOLENCE until further notice from the courts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCOURT WORKSHEET - FINAL JUDGMENT ENTERED UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketTEMPORARY ORDER - DOM VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketWAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJ DOM VIOL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketEvent DV scheduled on 3/10/2021 at 0130 PM, MX - Judge PAMELA VERGARA presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCase 272021DR000373DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/1/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BURGOS, SALLY DIANE