Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 03/30/2021 at 21:12:03 (UTC).

GRANT, DIANE M

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 GRANT, DIANE M was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBEE, DON JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARBEE, DON JR

 

Party Details

Decedent

GRANT, DIANE M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent Attorney

KELLER, JOHN MICHAEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $10.00 Receipt Number H 726783

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketAssessment 3 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketORDER ADMIT WILL TO PROBATE DTD 03/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketORDER FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION DTD 03/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $3.50 Receipt Number H 725707

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $3.50 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $3.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF WILL OF DIANE M. GRANT A/K/A DIANE HAMELIN GRANT

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $345.00 Receipt Number H 723088

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $345.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CP000277CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/1/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF DIANE M. GRANT ORG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketDEPOSIT/PRODUCTION OF WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CP000149CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/4/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KELLER, JOHN MICHAEL