Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 08/04/2020 at 16:23:10 (UTC).

GOSSELIN, ARTHUR E, PEREIRA, TINA H Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/31/2020 GOSSELIN, ARTHUR E, PEREIRA, TINA H was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

PEREIRA, TINA H

Decedent

GOSSELIN, ARTHUR E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

DAY, SANDRA H.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $9.00 Receipt Number H 679762

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $9.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $9.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketNOTICE: CONSOLIDATION PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION DTD 04/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketORDER ADMIT WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE DTD 04/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number H 677179

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketRECEIPT FILED OF NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION TINA PEREIRA

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION TESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH ARTHUR E. GOSSELIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketLAST WILL & TESTAMENT-COPY ARTHUR E. GOSSELIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketCase 272020CP000363CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF ARTHUR E. GOSSELIN ORG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketDEPOSIT/PRODUCTION OF WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketCase 272019CP001220CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAY, SANDRA H.