This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 07/13/2020 at 13:10:05 (UTC).

GOODSON, EBONY N

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 GOODSON, EBONY N was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are EINEMAN, THOMAS R and EINEMAN, THOMAS RALPH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

EINEMAN, THOMAS R

EINEMAN, THOMAS RALPH

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Respondent

GOODSON, EBONY N

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketEMAIL VERIFICATION FROM VITAL STATISTICS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketDOCUMENTS FILED - REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketORDER FILED FINAL JUDGMENT OF NAME CHANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketDOCUMENTS FILED - NOTICE OF FINAL HEARING ON 02/24/2020 AT 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketORDER FILED OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCompliance MISC has been created with due date of 1/6/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT (COPY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketDOCUMENTS FILED - LETTER TO JUDGE ABOUT BIRTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketDOCUMENTS FILED - FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketBIRTH CERTIFICATE COPY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR CIVIL INDIGENCY - INDIGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR REFERRAL TO GEN MAG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPETITION FOR NAME CHANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase 272019DR002452DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/6/2019

    Read MoreRead Less