Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 03/15/2021 at 18:43:33 (UTC).

GOOD, SAMANTHA VS GUNTER, TRAVIS

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 GOOD, SAMANTHA filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against GUNTER, TRAVIS. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are VERGARA, PAMELA STINNETTE and PAMELA VERGARA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

VERGARA, PAMELA STINNETTE

PAMELA VERGARA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GOOD, SAMANTHA

Respondent

GUNTER, TRAVIS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ON TRAVIS GUNTER ON 030121

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO HCSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketEvent DV scheduled on 3/10/2021 at 0130 PM, MX - Judge PAMELA VERGARA presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketWAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketPET FOR INJ SEXUAL VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCase 272021DR000381DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/1/2021

    Read MoreRead Less