This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 10/21/2020 at 21:12:37 (UTC).

GOMORI, ELISE, WEISBERGER, SANDY D Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 GOMORI, ELISE, WEISBERGER, SANDY D was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBEE, DON JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARBEE, DON JR

 

Party Details

Petitioners

WEISBERGER, SANDY D

GOMORI, ELISE

Decedent

WEISBERGER, SHIRLEY C

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketORDER FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION DTD 092920

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY DTD 092920

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $235.00 Receipt Number H 699651

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $235.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH SHIRLEY C. WEISBERGER ORG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketJOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT TRANSAMERICA PREMIER LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $235.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCase 272020CP001028CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less