Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 04/07/2019 at 18:17:04 (UTC).

GOLDMAN, GLORIA VS US BANK NA

Case Summary

On 03/14/2019 GOLDMAN, GLORIA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against US BANK NA. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RUPPE, KRISTIE and KRISTIE RUPPE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RUPPE, KRISTIE

KRISTIE RUPPE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOLDMAN, GLORIA

Defendant

US BANK NA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PECK, RICHARD KING

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO COMPEL (PLNTFS)

08/20/2019:MOTION TO COMPEL (PLNTFS)

RESPONSE TO DEFS FIRST REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (PLNTF, GLORIA GOLDMAN'S)

09/18/2019:RESPONSE TO DEFS FIRST REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (PLNTF, GLORIA GOLDMAN'S)

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLNTF, GLORIA GOLDMAN'S VERIFIED ANSWERS AND OBJECTIONS TO DEFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

09/18/2019:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLNTF, GLORIA GOLDMAN'S VERIFIED ANSWERS AND OBJECTIONS TO DEFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

COURT WORKSHEET - MOTION TO INVOLE THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE IS GRANTED

05/14/2019:COURT WORKSHEET - MOTION TO INVOLE THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE IS GRANTED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLNTF

08/19/2019:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLNTF

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC TO PLNTF (DEFS FIRST)

08/19/2019:REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC TO PLNTF (DEFS FIRST)

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEF (PLNTFS FIRST)

05/15/2019:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEF (PLNTFS FIRST)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES - FILED BY CHRISTI A. LAWSON, ATTY FOR DEF (EMAIL: clawson@foley.com)

05/14/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES - FILED BY CHRISTI A. LAWSON, ATTY FOR DEF (EMAIL: clawson@foley.com)

RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLNTFS MOTION TO STRIKE DEFS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT (DEFS)

09/03/2019:RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLNTFS MOTION TO STRIKE DEFS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT (DEFS)

PLAINTIFF'S ARGUMENT SUMMARY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO STATEMENT OF CLAIM

08/30/2019:PLAINTIFF'S ARGUMENT SUMMARY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO STATEMENT OF CLAIM

ORDER FILED ON PLNTFS MOTION TO STRIKE DEFS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - DTD 091219

09/12/2019:ORDER FILED ON PLNTFS MOTION TO STRIKE DEFS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - DTD 091219

COURT WORKSHEET - PL ATTY TO PREP ORDER

09/05/2019:COURT WORKSHEET - PL ATTY TO PREP ORDER

NOTICE OF HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL IS SCHEDULED FOR OCTOBER 7, 2019 @ 10:00 AM

08/23/2019:NOTICE OF HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL IS SCHEDULED FOR OCTOBER 7, 2019 @ 10:00 AM

RETURN OF SERVICE - SUMMONS RETD SERVED ON US BANK, N.A. D/B/A ACG CARD SERVICES, AT 032219

04/01/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE - SUMMONS RETD SERVED ON US BANK, N.A. D/B/A ACG CARD SERVICES, AT 032219

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: US BANK NA DBA ACG CARD SERVICES - PTC 051419 AT 9:30 CRTRM C

03/21/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: US BANK NA DBA ACG CARD SERVICES - PTC 051419 AT 9:30 CRTRM C

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY - APPROVED

03/20/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY - APPROVED

MOTION FILED TO INVOKE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

03/14/2019:MOTION FILED TO INVOKE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

03/14/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE - SUMMONS RETD SERVED ON US BANK, N.A. D/B/A ACG CARD SERVICES, AT 032219

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: US BANK NA DBA ACG CARD SERVICES - PTC 051419 AT 9:30 CRTRM C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Event AMPT scheduled on 5/14/2019 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge KRISTIE RUPPE presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY - APPROVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCUMENTS FILED - SMALL CLAIMS WORKJSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCUMENTS FILED - STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FILED TO PERMIT DISCOVERY OF DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FILED TO INVOKE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED US BANK NA DBA ACG CARD SERVICES (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Case 272019SC000660SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Event Date: 05/14/2019 09:30; Judge: RUPPE, KRISTIE; Docket Type: AMPT; Location: MX COURTROOM C

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PECK RICHARD K