This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 08/06/2020 at 13:06:18 (UTC).

GOFF, JAMIE LYNN, GOFF, KATHY M Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/08/2020 GOFF, JAMIE LYNN, GOFF, KATHY M was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioners

GOFF, MARK JD

GOFF, JAMIE LYNN

Decedent

GOFF, KATHY M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SNOW, ROBERT BRUCE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF LEGAL PUBLICATION TAMPA BAY TIMES ON 07/15/2020 AND 07/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketORDER FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION DTD 07/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $10.00 Receipt Number H 688261

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH KATHY M GOFF AKA MARY KATHLEEN GOFF AKA KATHLEEN P GOFF (ORIGINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH KATHY M GOFF AKA MARY KATHLEEN GOFF AKA KATHLEEN P GOFF (E-PORTAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $345.00 Receipt Number H 685167

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $345.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketCase 272020CP000569CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/8/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SNOW, ROBERT BRUCE