This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 10/21/2020 at 13:22:45 (UTC).

GLENLAKES MASTER HOMEOWNERS AS VS BRIENZA, MICHAEL

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 GLENLAKES MASTER HOMEOWNERS AS filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BRIENZA, MICHAEL. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HITZEMANN, KURT and HITZEMANN, KURT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HITZEMANN, KURT

HITZEMANN, KURT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GLENLAKES MASTER HOMEOWNERS AS

Defendant

BRIENZA, MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRANDT, ALLISON JEAN

 

Court Documents

WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS FILED BY DEF

11/05/2020:WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS FILED BY DEF

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST MICHAEL BRIENZA AS TRUSTEE OF THE MARGARET MASON REVOCABLE TRUST

01/04/2021:MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST MICHAEL BRIENZA AS TRUSTEE OF THE MARGARET MASON REVOCABLE TRUST

DEFAULT FOR ENTRY BY CLERK (BLANK)

01/04/2021:DEFAULT FOR ENTRY BY CLERK (BLANK)

DEFAULT NOT ENTERED ON MICHAEL BRIENZA, AS TRUSTEE OF THE MARGUERITE MASON REVOCABLE TRUST - PAPER FILED ON 110520

01/08/2021:DEFAULT NOT ENTERED ON MICHAEL BRIENZA, AS TRUSTEE OF THE MARGUERITE MASON REVOCABLE TRUST - PAPER FILED ON 110520

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

03/10/2021:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: MICHAEL BRIENZA

09/22/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: MICHAEL BRIENZA

COMPLAINT-FORECLOSURE COUNTY

09/21/2020:COMPLAINT-FORECLOSURE COUNTY

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR MICHAEL BRIENZA AS TRUSTEE - BLANK

09/21/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR MICHAEL BRIENZA AS TRUSTEE - BLANK

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

09/21/2020:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

COVER SHEET

09/21/2020:COVER SHEET

COVER SHEET

09/21/2020:COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: MICHAEL BRIENZA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $315.00 Receipt Number H 699641

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $315.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-FORECLOSURE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR MICHAEL BRIENZA - BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $315.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCase 272020CC000810CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GLENLAKES MASTER HOA INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRANDT , ALLISON JEAN