Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 04/07/2019 at 13:17:30 (UTC).

GIORDANO, EILEEN VS GHEORGHE, IULIAN Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/14/2019 GIORDANO, EILEEN filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against GHEORGHE, IULIAN. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RUPPE, KRISTIE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RUPPE, KRISTIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GIORDANO, EILEEN

Defendants

GHIOCEL, CONSTANTIN

GHIOCEL, MIHAELA

GHEORGHE, IULIAN

Not Classified By Court

GIORDANO, AGENT, EILEEN

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED - POSTED - MIHAELA GHIOCEL ON 03/29/2019 AT 0737 AM

04/02/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED - POSTED - MIHAELA GHIOCEL ON 03/29/2019 AT 0737 AM

WRIT OF POSSESSION TO DFDNTS MIHAELA GHIOCEL, CONSTANTIN GHIOCEL, IULIAN GHEORGHE (PL)

03/28/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION TO DFDNTS MIHAELA GHIOCEL, CONSTANTIN GHIOCEL, IULIAN GHEORGHE (PL)

ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY - DTD 032619

03/27/2019:ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY - DTD 032619

CLERK DEFAULT - EVICTION -AGAINST MICHAELA & CONSTANTIN GHIOCEL AND IULIAN GHEORGHE

03/26/2019:CLERK DEFAULT - EVICTION -AGAINST MICHAELA & CONSTANTIN GHIOCEL AND IULIAN GHEORGHE

MOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT

03/26/2019:MOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: POSTED ON MIHAELA GHIOCEL 031819

03/20/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: POSTED ON MIHAELA GHIOCEL 031819

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: POSTED ON CONSTANTIN GHIOCEL 031819

03/20/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: POSTED ON CONSTANTIN GHIOCEL 031819

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: POSTED ON JULIAN GHEORGHE 031819

03/20/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: POSTED ON JULIAN GHEORGHE 031819

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

03/14/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL ISSUED FOR IULIAN GHEORGHE

03/14/2019:SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL ISSUED FOR IULIAN GHEORGHE

SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL ISSUED FOR CONSTANTIN GHIOCEL

03/14/2019:SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL ISSUED FOR CONSTANTIN GHIOCEL

SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL ISSUED FOR MIHAELA GHIOCEL

03/14/2019:SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL ISSUED FOR MIHAELA GHIOCEL

STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

03/14/2019:STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR MIHAELA GHIOCEL, CONSTANTIN CHIOCEL AND IULIAN GHEORGHE

03/14/2019:MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR MIHAELA GHIOCEL, CONSTANTIN CHIOCEL AND IULIAN GHEORGHE

PETITION FOR EVICTION

03/14/2019:PETITION FOR EVICTION

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED - POSTED - MIHAELA GHIOCEL ON 03/29/2019 AT 0737 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION TO DFDNTS MIHAELA GHIOCEL, CONSTANTIN GHIOCEL, IULIAN GHEORGHE (PL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Payment received: $7.00 Receipt Number H 618518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $7.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY - DTD 032619

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK DEFAULT - EVICTION -AGAINST MICHAELA & CONSTANTIN GHIOCEL AND IULIAN GHEORGHE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: POSTED ON MIHAELA GHIOCEL 031819

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $236.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $236.00 Balance Remaining $236.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Active Process EVICTION SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Active Process EVICTION SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • EVICTION SUMMONS Active Process Deleted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Active Process EVICTION SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Active Process EVICTION SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Case 272019CC000370CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less