This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County on 08/08/2020 at 12:11:35 (UTC).

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPAN VS LETTIERI, CHARLES STEVEN Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/11/2019 GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LETTIERI, CHARLES STEVEN. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPAN

Defendants

LETTIERI, MICHAEL ANTHONY JR

LETTIERI, CHARLES STEVEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANLEY, CATHARINE DENISE

 

Court Documents

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED - MICHAEL ANTHONY LETTIERI JR

05/29/2020:ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED - MICHAEL ANTHONY LETTIERI JR

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED FOR MICHAEL ANTHONY LETTIERI JR (BLANK)

05/29/2020:ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED FOR MICHAEL ANTHONY LETTIERI JR (BLANK)

ORDER FILED ENLARGING TIME - PLNTF SHALL HAVE 120 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER TO SECURE SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT UPON MICHAEL ANTHONY LETTIERI JR DTD 041620

04/17/2020:ORDER FILED ENLARGING TIME - PLNTF SHALL HAVE 120 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER TO SECURE SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT UPON MICHAEL ANTHONY LETTIERI JR DTD 041620

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE OF PROCESS UPON MICHAEL ANTHONY LETTIERI JR FILED BY PLNTF

04/06/2020:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE OF PROCESS UPON MICHAEL ANTHONY LETTIERI JR FILED BY PLNTF

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ON MICHAEL ANTHONY LETTIERI JR

03/30/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ON MICHAEL ANTHONY LETTIERI JR

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK AGAINST CHARLES STEVEN LETTIERI

02/20/2020:DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK AGAINST CHARLES STEVEN LETTIERI

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

02/12/2020:MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

DEFAULT FOR ENTRY BY CLERK (BLANK)

02/12/2020:DEFAULT FOR ENTRY BY CLERK (BLANK)

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST CHARLES STEVEN LETTIERI

02/12/2020:MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST CHARLES STEVEN LETTIERI

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON CHARLES STEVEN LETTIERI (SUBST SERVED TO JASON GAYHEART) 121919

12/20/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON CHARLES STEVEN LETTIERI (SUBST SERVED TO JASON GAYHEART) 121919

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: MICHAEL ANTHONY LETTIERI, JR.

12/12/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: MICHAEL ANTHONY LETTIERI, JR.

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CHARLES STEVEN LETTIERI

12/12/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CHARLES STEVEN LETTIERI

SUMMONS ISSUED MICHAEL ANTHONY LETTIERI, JR. (BLANK)

12/11/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED MICHAEL ANTHONY LETTIERI, JR. (BLANK)

SUMMONS ISSUED CHARLES STEVEN LETTIERI (BLANK)

12/11/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED CHARLES STEVEN LETTIERI (BLANK)

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS litigation@hidayricke.com

12/11/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS litigation@hidayricke.com

COMPLAINT FOR AUTO NEGLIGENCE

12/11/2019:COMPLAINT FOR AUTO NEGLIGENCE

COVER SHEET

12/11/2019:COVER SHEET

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED - MICHAEL ANTHONY LETTIERI JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED FOR MICHAEL ANTHONY LETTIERI JR (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $10.00 Receipt Number H 683927

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FILED ENLARGING TIME - PLNTF SHALL HAVE 120 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER TO SECURE SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT UPON MICHAEL ANTHONY LETTIERI JR DTD 041620

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE OF PROCESS UPON MICHAEL ANTHONY LETTIERI JR FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ON MICHAEL ANTHONY LETTIERI JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK AGAINST CHARLES STEVEN LETTIERI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $420.00 Receipt Number H 659859

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $420.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED MICHAEL ANTHONY LETTIERI, JR. (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED CHARLES STEVEN LETTIERI (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS litigation@hidayricke.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR AUTO NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketCase 272019CA001388CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CATHARINE D HANLEY, ESQ