This case was last updated from Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 11/01/2021 at 23:39:52 (UTC).

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPAN VS HERRMANN, JOSEPH CHARLES III Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/30/2021 GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPAN filed an Other lawsuit against HERRMANN, JOSEPH CHARLES III. This case was filed in Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE and SCAGLIONE, DONALD E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE

SCAGLIONE, DONALD E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPAN

Defendants

HERRMANN, JOSEPH CHARLES III

HERRMANN, JOSEPH JAMES JR

 

Court Documents

NOTICE RE NON-JURY REASSIGNMENT DTD 100621

10/27/2021:NOTICE RE NON-JURY REASSIGNMENT DTD 100621

MEMORANDUM - STRICT COMP W/ FL RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMIN

04/05/2021:MEMORANDUM - STRICT COMP W/ FL RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMIN

DOCUMENTS FILED - ADMIN ORDER: A-2020-12-I

04/01/2021:DOCUMENTS FILED - ADMIN ORDER: A-2020-12-I

DOCUMENTS FILED - ADMIN NOTICE

04/01/2021:DOCUMENTS FILED - ADMIN NOTICE

DOCUMENTS FILED - SUPREME COURT OF FL NO. AOSC20-23 AMENDMENT 10

04/01/2021:DOCUMENTS FILED - SUPREME COURT OF FL NO. AOSC20-23 AMENDMENT 10

COVER SHEET

03/30/2021:COVER SHEET

ORDER DENYING - DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS DTD 011521

03/30/2021:ORDER DENYING - DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS DTD 011521

DOCUMENTS FILED - TRANSFER LETTER FROM LAW OFFICE OF YATES & SCHILLER PA DTD 032521

03/30/2021:DOCUMENTS FILED - TRANSFER LETTER FROM LAW OFFICE OF YATES & SCHILLER PA DTD 032521

ORDER FILED ON PLNTFS MTN TO AMEND ITS COMPLAINT AND TRANSFER TO CIRCUIT COURT JURISDICTION IS GRANTED DTD 031121

03/30/2021:ORDER FILED ON PLNTFS MTN TO AMEND ITS COMPLAINT AND TRANSFER TO CIRCUIT COURT JURISDICTION IS GRANTED DTD 031121

MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY COUNTER-DEF, BELINDA SMITH

03/30/2021:MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY COUNTER-DEF, BELINDA SMITH

MOTION TO DISMISS

03/30/2021:MOTION TO DISMISS

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY JOSEPH HERRMANN III & JOSEPH JAMES HERMANN

03/30/2021:ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY JOSEPH HERRMANN III & JOSEPH JAMES HERMANN

ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY JOSEPH HERRMANN III

03/30/2021:ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY JOSEPH HERRMANN III

PLNTF'S MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT AND TRANSFER TO CIRCUIT COURT JURISDICTION

03/30/2021:PLNTF'S MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT AND TRANSFER TO CIRCUIT COURT JURISDICTION

AMENDED COMPLAINT

03/30/2021:AMENDED COMPLAINT

NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY TO DEF JOSEPH CHARLES HERRMANN III

03/30/2021:NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY TO DEF JOSEPH CHARLES HERRMANN III

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ON JOSEPH CHARLES HERRMANN III @082420 (SUBST SERVED)

03/30/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ON JOSEPH CHARLES HERRMANN III @082420 (SUBST SERVED)

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ON JOSEPH JAMES HERRMANN JR (SUBST SERVED)

03/30/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ON JOSEPH JAMES HERRMANN JR (SUBST SERVED)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE RE NON-JURY REASSIGNMENT DTD 100621

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM - STRICT COMP W/ FL RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCUMENTS FILED - ADMIN ORDER: A-2020-12-I

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCUMENTS FILED - ADMIN NOTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCUMENTS FILED - SUPREME COURT OF FL NO. AOSC20-23 AMENDMENT 10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • Docket-- END OF TRANSFERRED DOCUMENTS --

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DENYING - DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS DTD 011521

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCUMENTS FILED - TRANSFER LETTER FROM LAW OFFICE OF YATES & SCHILLER PA DTD 032521

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FILED ON PLNTFS MTN TO AMEND ITS COMPLAINT AND TRANSFER TO CIRCUIT COURT JURISDICTION IS GRANTED DTD 031121

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE SUMMARY/HISTORY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON PLNTF'S MOTION TO AMEND ITS COMPLAINT AND TRANSFER TO CIRCUIT COURT JURISDICTION IS GRANTED DTD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket-- THE FOLLOWING DOCUMENTS WERE TRANSFERRED --

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number H 728675

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CA000243CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/30/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant