This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 04/29/2022 at 07:44:53 (UTC).

GARCIA, FERNANDO VS AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE C

Case Summary

On 12/20/2021 GARCIA, FERNANDO filed an Other lawsuit against AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE C. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEALIS, KRISTIE MARIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEALIS, KRISTIE MARIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARCIA, FERNANDO

Defendant

AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MULLINAX, MATTHEW KENNETH

Defendant Attorney

VAGNONI, LAUREN MARIE

 

Court Documents

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON 070622 AT 1:00 VIA TELEPHONE ON DEFS MTN TO DISMISS PLNTFS COMPLAINT OR IN THE ALT, MTN FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT FILED BY PLNTF

04/04/2022:AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON 070622 AT 1:00 VIA TELEPHONE ON DEFS MTN TO DISMISS PLNTFS COMPLAINT OR IN THE ALT, MTN FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT FILED BY PLNTF

ORDER FILED - PROPOSED AGREED ORDER GRANTING MOTINO TO APPEAR TELEPH ON 051222 AT 930AM=GRANTED PARTIES TO COORD CONF CALL PRIOR TO CALLING IN DTD 031022

03/10/2022:ORDER FILED - PROPOSED AGREED ORDER GRANTING MOTINO TO APPEAR TELEPH ON 051222 AT 930AM=GRANTED PARTIES TO COORD CONF CALL PRIOR TO CALLING IN DTD 031022

MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

03/08/2022:MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

NOTICE OF HEARING 5/12/22 9:30 AM

02/28/2022:NOTICE OF HEARING 5/12/22 9:30 AM

RESPONSE TO MOTION IN OPPOSITION TO DEF'S MOTION TO STAY DISC OR MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER FILED BY PL

02/25/2022:RESPONSE TO MOTION IN OPPOSITION TO DEF'S MOTION TO STAY DISC OR MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER FILED BY PL

MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY OR MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND INCORP MEMO OF LAW FILED BY DEF

02/18/2022:MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY OR MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND INCORP MEMO OF LAW FILED BY DEF

NOTICE OF FILING TRIAL COURT ORDERS IN SUPPORT OF PLNTFS RESPONSE TO DEFS MTN TO DISMISS (ATTACHED) FILED BY PLNTF

01/27/2022:NOTICE OF FILING TRIAL COURT ORDERS IN SUPPORT OF PLNTFS RESPONSE TO DEFS MTN TO DISMISS (ATTACHED) FILED BY PLNTF

NOTICE OF FILING SUPREME COURT CASES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFS MTN TO DISMISS (ATTACHED) FILED BY PLNTF

01/27/2022:NOTICE OF FILING SUPREME COURT CASES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFS MTN TO DISMISS (ATTACHED) FILED BY PLNTF

RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS OF DEF FILED BY PLNTF

01/27/2022:RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS OF DEF FILED BY PLNTF

MOTION TO DISMISS PL'S COMPLAINT, OR IN THE ALT, MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

01/24/2022:MOTION TO DISMISS PL'S COMPLAINT, OR IN THE ALT, MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF LAUREN M VAGNONI ESQ AS ATTY FOR DEF AND EMAIL DESIG lvagnoni@aiiflorida.com

01/05/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF LAUREN M VAGNONI ESQ AS ATTY FOR DEF AND EMAIL DESIG lvagnoni@aiiflorida.com

NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS OF SUMMONS ON AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA ON 010422 (ATTACHED) FILED BY PLNTF

01/04/2022:NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS OF SUMMONS ON AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA ON 010422 (ATTACHED) FILED BY PLNTF

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE OF FLORIDA

12/30/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE OF FLORIDA

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/20/2021:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

12/20/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE

12/20/2021:NOTICE OF SERVICE

PETITION/COMPLAINT FILED

12/20/2021:PETITION/COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA ~ BLANK

12/20/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA ~ BLANK

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON 070622 AT 1:00 VIA TELEPHONE ON DEFS MTN TO DISMISS PLNTFS COMPLAINT OR IN THE ALT, MTN FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FILED - PROPOSED AGREED ORDER GRANTING MOTINO TO APPEAR TELEPH ON 051222 AT 930AM=GRANTED PARTIES TO COORD CONF CALL PRIOR TO CALLING IN DTD 031022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING 5/12/22 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO MOTION IN OPPOSITION TO DEF'S MOTION TO STAY DISC OR MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER FILED BY PL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY OR MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND INCORP MEMO OF LAW FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING TRIAL COURT ORDERS IN SUPPORT OF PLNTFS RESPONSE TO DEFS MTN TO DISMISS (ATTACHED) FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING SUPREME COURT CASES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFS MTN TO DISMISS (ATTACHED) FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS OF DEF FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS PL'S COMPLAINT, OR IN THE ALT, MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA ~ BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CC001452CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE C is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MULLINAX MATTHEW K