This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County on 08/08/2020 at 12:11:23 (UTC).

GALLAGHER, ELYSSA VS COSTELLO, JAN Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/12/2019 GALLAGHER, ELYSSA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against COSTELLO, JAN. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GALLAGHER, ELYSSA

Defendants

COSTELLO, JAN

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

DOSTIE, GRANT RENE

JAMES, JILLIAN MAY

EDWARDS, THENA

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD OF DEF, PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY FILED BY DEF, JAN COSTELLO

04/29/2020:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD OF DEF, PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY FILED BY DEF, JAN COSTELLO

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - (DEPOSITION WILL NOT BE RECORDED UNLESS NOTICED AS SUCH) (PLEASE ADVISE IF AN INTERPRETER IS NECESSARY) - TUESDAY, JULY 28, 2020, ELYSSA GALLAGHER, 1:00 PM @ COMPASS REPORTING WEBEX MEETING BY EMAIL INVITATION - FILED BY DEFENDANT, PROGRESSIVE

04/24/2020:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - (DEPOSITION WILL NOT BE RECORDED UNLESS NOTICED AS SUCH) (PLEASE ADVISE IF AN INTERPRETER IS NECESSARY) - TUESDAY, JULY 28, 2020, ELYSSA GALLAGHER, 1:00 PM @ COMPASS REPORTING WEBEX MEETING BY EMAIL INVITATION - FILED BY DEFENDANT, PROGRESSIVE

ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (VERIFIED) FILED BY PLNTF

04/13/2020:ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (VERIFIED) FILED BY PLNTF

NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT UPON COUNSEL FOR PLNTF FILED BY DEF, PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

04/09/2020:NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT UPON COUNSEL FOR PLNTF FILED BY DEF, PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD FILED BY DEF, JAN COSTELLO

04/06/2020:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD FILED BY DEF, JAN COSTELLO

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD OF PLNTF FILED BY DEF, PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

03/02/2020:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD OF PLNTF FILED BY DEF, PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEF

02/28/2020:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEF

ORDER FILED TO RESPOND - PLNTF SHALL HAVE 10 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER TO FILE RESPONSE TO DEF MTN TO STRIKE CLAIM FOR INTEREST AND MTN FOR EXTENSTION OF TIME FOR DEF TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY IS GRANTED - DEF SHALL HAVE 10 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER TO FILE A RESPONSE TO PLNTFS DISCOVERY REQUESTS AND ORDER EST MTN PRACTICE PROCEDURE DTD 021920

02/19/2020:ORDER FILED TO RESPOND - PLNTF SHALL HAVE 10 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER TO FILE RESPONSE TO DEF MTN TO STRIKE CLAIM FOR INTEREST AND MTN FOR EXTENSTION OF TIME FOR DEF TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY IS GRANTED - DEF SHALL HAVE 10 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER TO FILE A RESPONSE TO PLNTFS DISCOVERY REQUESTS AND ORDER EST MTN PRACTICE PROCEDURE DTD 021920

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY FOR DEF, PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY TO DAVID L HENDRICKS ESQ AND DESIG OF EMAIL ADDRESS TampaHC@Progressive.com

02/19/2020:NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY FOR DEF, PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY TO DAVID L HENDRICKS ESQ AND DESIG OF EMAIL ADDRESS TampaHC@Progressive.com

NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF, JAN COSTELLO

02/19/2020:NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF, JAN COSTELLO

PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/07/2020:PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED SUMMONS, COMPLAINT ON JAN COSTELLO ON 013020

02/06/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED SUMMONS, COMPLAINT ON JAN COSTELLO ON 013020

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISS OF PLNTF FILED BY DEF, PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

01/08/2020:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISS OF PLNTF FILED BY DEF, PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

MOTION FILED TO STRIKE CLAIM FOR INTERERST FILED BY DEF, PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

01/08/2020:MOTION FILED TO STRIKE CLAIM FOR INTERERST FILED BY DEF, PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF AMY K RECLA ESQ AS COUNSEL FOR DEF PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY AND DESIG OF EMAIL ADDRESS TampaHC@Progressive.com

01/08/2020:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF AMY K RECLA ESQ AS COUNSEL FOR DEF PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY AND DESIG OF EMAIL ADDRESS TampaHC@Progressive.com

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

12/13/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

12/12/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

SUMMONS ISSUED TO PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY ~ BLANK

12/12/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY ~ BLANK

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION ON 011321 AT 1:30 W/ MEDIATOR DICK RAHTER FILED BY DEF, PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES TO CO-DEF, JAN COSTELLO (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEF, PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT ON PLNTF FILED BY DEF, JAN COSTELLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES TO DEF, JAN COSTELLO (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT UPON DEF, JAN COSTELLO ON 052020 FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF UNVERIFED ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD OF DEF, PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY FILED BY DEF, JAN COSTELLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - (DEPOSITION WILL NOT BE RECORDED UNLESS NOTICED AS SUCH) (PLEASE ADVISE IF AN INTERPRETER IS NECESSARY) - TUESDAY, JULY 28, 2020, ELYSSA GALLAGHER, 1:00 PM @ COMPASS REPORTING WEBEX MEETING BY EMAIL INVITATION - FILED BY DEFENDANT, PROGRESSIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (VERIFIED) FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTERROGATORY NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTERROGATORY NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY ~ BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO JAN COSTELLO ~ BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketCase 272019CA001394CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOSTIE , GRANT RENE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JAMES , JILLIAN MAY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EDWARDS , THENA