Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 05/05/2019 at 13:16:02 (UTC).

GALBO, ROBERT VS CARTER, SUSAN Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/11/2019 GALBO, ROBERT filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against CARTER, SUSAN. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RUPPE, KRISTIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RUPPE, KRISTIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GALBO, ROBERT

Defendants

CARTER, SUSAN

KLABUNDE, MATTHEW

Not Classified By Court

KLAYBUNDE, MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

UNDELIVERED MAIL RETURNED SUSAN CARTER LOP 6/23/20

05/06/2020:UNDELIVERED MAIL RETURNED SUSAN CARTER LOP 6/23/20

NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION AND COURT'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE ACTION

04/24/2020:NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION AND COURT'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE ACTION

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

04/11/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: SUSAN CARTER

04/11/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: SUSAN CARTER

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: MATTHEW KLAMBUNDE AKA MATTHEW KLAYBUNDE

04/11/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: MATTHEW KLAMBUNDE AKA MATTHEW KLAYBUNDE

DISCLOSURE FROM NON LAWYER

04/11/2019:DISCLOSURE FROM NON LAWYER

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR SUSAN CARTER

04/11/2019:MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR SUSAN CARTER

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR MATTHEW KLABUNDE AKA MATTHEW KLAYBUNDE

04/11/2019:MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR MATTHEW KLABUNDE AKA MATTHEW KLAYBUNDE

STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

04/11/2019:STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

PETITION FOR EVICTION

04/11/2019:PETITION FOR EVICTION

NOTICE - EVICTION 3 DAY

04/11/2019:NOTICE - EVICTION 3 DAY

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: SUSAN CARTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: MATTHEW KLAMBUNDE AKA MATTHEW KLAYBUNDE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DISCLOSURE FROM NON LAWYER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR SUSAN CARTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR MATTHEW KLABUNDE AKA MATTHEW KLAYBUNDE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - EVICTION 3 DAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Payment received: $205.00 Receipt Number H 620878

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $20.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Case 272019CC000510CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less