This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County on 05/07/2021 at 16:19:28 (UTC).

FUERST, ROBERT D VS DAVI, YULETH M Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/07/2021 FUERST, ROBERT D filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DAVI, YULETH M. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are VERGARA, PAMELA STINNETTE and VERGARA, PAMELA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

VERGARA, PAMELA STINNETTE

VERGARA, PAMELA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FUERST, ROBERT D

Defendants

FLADDS SEPTIC SERVICE LLC

SAVELL, JEREMY A

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE

HENDERSON, JEFFERY J

DAVI, YULETH M

Not Classified By Court

CUPITO, YULETH M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOWMAN, STEPHANIE ANNE

Defendant Attorneys

JONES, GREGORY DAVID

UNICE, THOMAS ROBERT

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISS (AMENDED) FROM DEF'S, YULETH D. DAVI AND JEREMY A. SAVELL (AS TO FOOTER ON PG 1 ONLY) -FILED BY PLNTF

04/30/2021:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISS (AMENDED) FROM DEF'S, YULETH D. DAVI AND JEREMY A. SAVELL (AS TO FOOTER ON PG 1 ONLY) -FILED BY PLNTF

REPLY TO ANSWER/AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFS, YULETH M DAVI AND JEREMY A SAVELL FILED BY PLNTF

04/28/2021:REPLY TO ANSWER/AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFS, YULETH M DAVI AND JEREMY A SAVELL FILED BY PLNTF

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF, YULETH M DAVI

04/22/2021:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF, YULETH M DAVI

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF T.R. UNICE JR ESQ ON BEHALF OF DEFS, YULETH M DAVI AND JEREMY A SAVELL AND EMAIL DESIG service@unicesalzman.com

04/22/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF T.R. UNICE JR ESQ ON BEHALF OF DEFS, YULETH M DAVI AND JEREMY A SAVELL AND EMAIL DESIG service@unicesalzman.com

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC (FIRST) UPON PLNTF FILED BY DEFS, YULETH M DAVI AND JEREMY A SAVELL

04/22/2021:REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC (FIRST) UPON PLNTF FILED BY DEFS, YULETH M DAVI AND JEREMY A SAVELL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF GREGORY D JONES ESQ ON BEHALF OF DEF, FLADD'S SEPTIC SERVICE LLC AND EMAIL DESIG gjones@rywantalvarez.com

04/22/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF GREGORY D JONES ESQ ON BEHALF OF DEF, FLADD'S SEPTIC SERVICE LLC AND EMAIL DESIG gjones@rywantalvarez.com

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON YULETH M DAVI 041521

04/22/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON YULETH M DAVI 041521

SERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS ON FLADD'S SEPTIC SERVICE LLC 041521

04/22/2021:SERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS ON FLADD'S SEPTIC SERVICE LLC 041521

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED yulet m davi 4/16/21 summons, complaint for damages and demand for jury trial

04/21/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED yulet m davi 4/16/21 summons, complaint for damages and demand for jury trial

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

04/08/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: YULETH M DAVI

04/08/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: YULETH M DAVI

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: JEFFERY J HENDERSON

04/08/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: JEFFERY J HENDERSON

SUMMONS ISSUED TO PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY ~ BLANK

04/07/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY ~ BLANK

SUMMONS ISSUED TO JEREMY A SAVELL ~ BLANK

04/07/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO JEREMY A SAVELL ~ BLANK

SUMMONS ISSUED TO YULETH M DAVI ~ BLANK

04/07/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO YULETH M DAVI ~ BLANK

SUMMONS ISSUED TO FLADD'S SEPTIC SERVICE LLC ~ BLANK

04/07/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO FLADD'S SEPTIC SERVICE LLC ~ BLANK

COMPLAINT FOR AUTO NEGLIGENCE

04/07/2021:COMPLAINT FOR AUTO NEGLIGENCE

COVER SHEET

04/07/2021:COVER SHEET

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISS (AMENDED) FROM DEF'S, YULETH D. DAVI AND JEREMY A. SAVELL (AS TO FOOTER ON PG 1 ONLY) -FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO ANSWER/AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFS, YULETH M DAVI AND JEREMY A SAVELL FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISS FROM DEF'S, YULETH D. DAVI AND JEREMY A. SAVELL -FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF, YULETH M DAVI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY (FIRST SET) UPON PLNTF FILED BY DEF, YULETH M DAVI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF T.R. UNICE JR ESQ ON BEHALF OF DEFS, YULETH M DAVI AND JEREMY A SAVELL AND EMAIL DESIG service@unicesalzman.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC (FIRST) UPON PLNTF FILED BY DEFS, YULETH M DAVI AND JEREMY A SAVELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY YULETH M DAVI AND JEREMY A SAVELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF GREGORY D JONES ESQ ON BEHALF OF DEF, FLADD'S SEPTIC SERVICE LLC AND EMAIL DESIG gjones@rywantalvarez.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON YULETH M DAVI 041521

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: JEFFERY J HENDERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY ~ BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO JEREMY A SAVELL ~ BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO YULETH M DAVI ~ BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO FLADD'S SEPTIC SERVICE LLC ~ BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO JEFFERY J HENDERSON ~ BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR AUTO NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CA000266CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/7/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOWMAN, STEPHANIE ANNE