This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 07/13/2020 at 13:10:27 (UTC).

FUENTES, RAFAEL JR VS FUENTES, TANYA LYN

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 FUENTES, RAFAEL JR filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against FUENTES, TANYA LYN. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are EINEMAN, THOMAS R and EINEMAN, THOMAS RALPH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

EINEMAN, THOMAS R

EINEMAN, THOMAS RALPH

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FUENTES, RAFAEL JR

Respondent

FUENTES, TANYA LYN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF PERIOD TO FILE EXCEPTIONS TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE'S REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF PERIOD TO FILE EXCEPTIONS TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE'S REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDG SIMP DISS MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketDOCUMENTS FILED - REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF - LIMITATION OF SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketORDER FILED REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING 1/9/2020 AT 10AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketWAIVER OF FINANCIAL AFFIDAVITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF CORROBORATING WITNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketMARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketRULES OF COURTROOM CIVILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS - RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPET - SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $408.00 Receipt Number H 659057

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $408.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase 272019DR002449DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/6/2019

    Read MoreRead Less