This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 10/21/2020 at 19:38:00 (UTC).

FRITZE, MICHELLE VS FRITZE, WAYNE

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 FRITZE, MICHELLE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against FRITZE, WAYNE. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBEE, DON JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARBEE, DON JR

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FRITZE, MICHELLE

Respondent

FRITZE, WAYNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

EVILSIZER, ERIC J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED WAYNE FRITZE ON 9/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY LAW ORDER INVOLVING PARENTING ISSUES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: WAYNE FRITZE SIGNED AND SEALED BY CLER ON 09/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $418.00 Receipt Number H 699663

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $418.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY (UCCJEA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $418.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCase 272020DR001682DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less