This case was last updated from Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 11/02/2021 at 03:00:53 (UTC).

FREDERICK, FREDERICK VS UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALT

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 FREDERICK, FREDERICK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALT. This case was filed in Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are VERGARA, PAMELA STINNETTE and VERGARA, PAMELA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

VERGARA, PAMELA STINNETTE

VERGARA, PAMELA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FREDERICK, FREDERICK

Defendant

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GONZALEZ, ROBERT FRANCIS

Defendant Attorney

TYK, JULIE A

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF FILING PRIVILEGE LOG (ATTACHED) FILED BY DEF

10/01/2021:NOTICE OF FILING PRIVILEGE LOG (ATTACHED) FILED BY DEF

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD (SECOND) FILED BY DEF

10/01/2021:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD (SECOND) FILED BY DEF

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD (FIRST) FILED BY DEF

10/01/2021:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD (FIRST) FILED BY DEF

ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (SECOND SET) FILED BY DEF

10/01/2021:ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (SECOND SET) FILED BY DEF

ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (FIRST) FILED BY DEF

10/01/2021:ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (FIRST) FILED BY DEF

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISS FILED BY DEF

10/01/2021:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISS FILED BY DEF

NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY (FIRST SET) TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

10/01/2021:NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY (FIRST SET) TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (FIRST) TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

10/01/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE (FIRST) TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

09/03/2021:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

ORDER FILED (AGREED) ON DEFS REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLNTFS FIRST SET OF DISCOVERY REQUESTS IS GRANTED - ON OR BEFORE 092721 DTD 082721

08/27/2021:ORDER FILED (AGREED) ON DEFS REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLNTFS FIRST SET OF DISCOVERY REQUESTS IS GRANTED - ON OR BEFORE 092721 DTD 082721

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLNTFS SECOND SET OF DISCOVERY REQUESTS FILED BY DEF

08/19/2021:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLNTFS SECOND SET OF DISCOVERY REQUESTS FILED BY DEF

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLNTF'S COMPLAINT

08/02/2021:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLNTF'S COMPLAINT

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR: OF 2ND SET OF INTERROGS TO DEF TO ALL PARTIES ON 071921

07/19/2021:CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR: OF 2ND SET OF INTERROGS TO DEF TO ALL PARTIES ON 071921

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR: OF 2ND REQUEST FOR PROD TO DEF ON DEF ON 071921

07/19/2021:CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR: OF 2ND REQUEST FOR PROD TO DEF ON DEF ON 071921

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR: OF FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIOINS TO DEF ON DEF ON 071921

07/19/2021:CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR: OF FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIOINS TO DEF ON DEF ON 071921

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF JULIE A TYK ESQ ON BEHALF OF DEF AND EMAIL DESIG jtyk@pdmplaw.com

07/19/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF JULIE A TYK ESQ ON BEHALF OF DEF AND EMAIL DESIG jtyk@pdmplaw.com

SERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS FORWARDED BY ELECTRONIC DELIVERY TO UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY 071221

07/12/2021:SERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS FORWARDED BY ELECTRONIC DELIVERY TO UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY 071221

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & INSURANCE COMPANY

07/01/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & INSURANCE COMPANY

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING PRIVILEGE LOG (ATTACHED) FILED BY DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD (SECOND) FILED BY DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD (FIRST) FILED BY DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (SECOND SET) FILED BY DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (FIRST) FILED BY DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISS FILED BY DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY (FIRST SET) TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE (FIRST) TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FILED (AGREED) ON DEFS REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLNTFS FIRST SET OF DISCOVERY REQUESTS IS GRANTED - ON OR BEFORE 092721 DTD 082721

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTERROGATORY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS pleadings@flinslaw.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ~ BLANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CA000527CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/30/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gonzalez, Robert Francis, ESQ.