Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 03/26/2021 at 19:34:18 (UTC).

FRANCE, ANGELA MARIE VS MACRIS, JAMES PETER

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 FRANCE, ANGELA MARIE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MACRIS, JAMES PETER. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EINEMAN, THOMAS RALPH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EINEMAN, THOMAS RALPH

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FRANCE, ANGELA MARIE

Respondent

MACRIS, JAMES PETER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketNOTICE THAT SCHEDULED HEARING WILL BE HELD VIA ZOOM VIDEOCONFERENCING 04/01/2021 AT 9:30 A.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMB-RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMB-PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ON 4/1/2021 AT 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketWAIVER OF FINANCIAL AFFIDAVITS IN SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF -LIMITATION SIGNED BY BOTH PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketORDER FILED OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE SCHEDULG MEETING W/SELF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDRIVERS LICENSE COPY DL WIFE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF CORROBORATING WITNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF RESIDENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY LAW ORDER WITHOUT CHILDREN'S ISSUES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $408.00 Receipt Number H 723009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $408.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCase 272021DR000378DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/1/2021

    Read MoreRead Less