This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County on 08/08/2020 at 12:12:37 (UTC).

FERRARO, JASON VS COSTELLO, JAN Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/12/2019 FERRARO, JASON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against COSTELLO, JAN. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FERRARO, JASON

Defendants

COSTELLO, JAN

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

DOSTIE, GRANT RENE

JAMES, JILLIAN MAY

EDWARDS, THENA

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT UPON COUNSEL FOR PLNTF FILED BY DEF, PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

06/12/2020:NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT UPON COUNSEL FOR PLNTF FILED BY DEF, PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT UPON DEF, JAN COSTELLO ON 052020 FILED BY PLNTF

05/20/2020:NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT UPON DEF, JAN COSTELLO ON 052020 FILED BY PLNTF

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEFS

05/13/2020:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEFS

ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (VERIFIED) FILED BY PLNTF

04/03/2020:ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (VERIFIED) FILED BY PLNTF

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD FILED BY PLNTF

03/31/2020:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD FILED BY PLNTF

ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLNTF

03/31/2020:ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLNTF

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISS OF PLNTF FILED BY DEF, PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

03/26/2020:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISS OF PLNTF FILED BY DEF, PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEF

03/10/2020:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEF

NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY RE MOTOR VEHICLE NEGLIGENCE TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF, PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE

02/21/2020:NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY RE MOTOR VEHICLE NEGLIGENCE TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF, PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF THENA EDWARDS ESQ AS COUNSEL FOR DEF, PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE AND DESIG OF EMAIL ADDRESS TampaHC@Progressive.com

02/21/2020:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF THENA EDWARDS ESQ AS COUNSEL FOR DEF, PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE AND DESIG OF EMAIL ADDRESS TampaHC@Progressive.com

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE

02/21/2020:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF, JAN COSTELLO

02/19/2020:REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF, JAN COSTELLO

NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF, JAN COSTELLO

02/19/2020:NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF, JAN COSTELLO

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISS OF PLNTF FILED BY DEF, JAN COSTELLO

02/19/2020:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISS OF PLNTF FILED BY DEF, JAN COSTELLO

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY JAN COSTELLO

02/19/2020:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY JAN COSTELLO

INTERROGATORY

12/12/2019:INTERROGATORY

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS DEF - PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

12/12/2019:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS DEF - PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS DEF-- JAN COSTELLO

12/12/2019:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS DEF-- JAN COSTELLO

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION ON 011321 AT 9:30 W/ MEDIATOR DICK RAHTER FILED BY DEF, PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT UPON DEF, PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY ON 062420 FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACCEPTANCE - OF PLNTFS PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FILED ON 052020 FILED BY DEF, JAN COSTELLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT UPON COUNSEL FOR PLNTF FILED BY DEF, PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT UPON DEF, JAN COSTELLO ON 052020 FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (DEPOSITION WILL NOT BE RECORDED UNLESS NOTICED AS SUCH) (PLEASE ADVISE IF AN INTERPRETER IS NECESSARY) - TUESDAY, JULY 28, 2020 @ 11:00 AM WITH JASON FERRARO @ COMPASS REPORTING, WEBEX MEETING BY EMAIL INVITATION - FILED BY DEFENDANT, PROGRESSIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF JASON FERRARO ON 072820 AT 11:00 FILED BY DEF, JAN COSTELLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD OF DEF, JAN COSTELLO FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (VERIFIED) FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS DEF-- JAN COSTELLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR AUTO NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY C/O CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED JAN COSTELLO (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $420.00 Receipt Number H 659913

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $420.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketCase 272019CA001392CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOSTIE , GRANT RENE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JAMES , JILLIAN MAY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EDWARDS , THENA