This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 05/31/2019 at 18:15:55 (UTC).

FERGUSON, THOMAS JR VS TROPIC SHORES REALTY

Case Summary

On 05/07/2019 FERGUSON, THOMAS JR filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TROPIC SHORES REALTY. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RUPPE, KRISTIE and KRISTIE RUPPE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RUPPE, KRISTIE

KRISTIE RUPPE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FERGUSON, THOMAS JR

Defendant

TROPIC SHORES REALTY

 

Court Documents

SERVICE - CERT MAIL RET SERVED ON SAGE HEUGEL REP, TROPIC SHORES REALTY 051019

05/13/2019:SERVICE - CERT MAIL RET SERVED ON SAGE HEUGEL REP, TROPIC SHORES REALTY 051019

DOCUMENTS FILED - SMALL CLAIMS WORKSHEET

05/07/2019:DOCUMENTS FILED - SMALL CLAIMS WORKSHEET

STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

05/07/2019:STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

STATEMENT OF CLAIM $ 975.00

05/07/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM $ 975.00

SUMMONS ISSUED W/STATE OF CLAM FOR TROPIC SHORES REALTY P/T 060419 @ 9:00 AM

05/07/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED W/STATE OF CLAM FOR TROPIC SHORES REALTY P/T 060419 @ 9:00 AM

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE - CERT MAIL RET SERVED ON SAGE HEUGEL REP, TROPIC SHORES REALTY 051019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCUMENTS FILED - SMALL CLAIMS WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM $ 975.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED W/STATE OF CLAM FOR TROPIC SHORES REALTY P/T 060419 @ 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Payment received: $199.00 Receipt Number H 625112

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $199.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Active Process NOTICE OF PRETRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Event AMPT scheduled on 6/4/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge KRISTIE RUPPE presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $199.00 Balance Remaining $199.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $192.00 Balance Remaining $192.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Case 272019SC001092SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/7/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Event Date: 06/04/2019 09:00; Judge: RUPPE, KRISTIE; Docket Type: AMPT; Location: MX COURTROOM C

    Read MoreRead Less