Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 03/26/2021 at 19:35:49 (UTC).

FAWLS, LOUELLA PATRICK VS RIVERA, SAMUEL JR

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 FAWLS, LOUELLA PATRICK filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against RIVERA, SAMUEL JR. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FAWLS, LOUELLA PATRICK

Respondent

RIVERA, SAMUEL JR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF ADMINISTRATIVE PROCEEDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE-ESTABLISH ADMIN SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCase 272021DR000385DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/1/2021

    Read MoreRead Less