This case was last updated from Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/18/2022 at 16:24:41 (UTC).

ESTATE OF DIANNE WEBBER Et Al VS ASHORE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/19/2022 ESTATE OF DIANNE WEBBER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ASHORE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC. This case was filed in Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE and SCAGLIONE, DONALD E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE

SCAGLIONE, DONALD E

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HELLYAR, ROBERT JR

ESTATE OF DIANNE WEBBER

Defendants

NSS ALF BROOKSVILLE LLC

NOBLE DEVELOPMENT AND HOLDING

ASHORE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC

SEAWINDS PROPERTIES LLC

SHEXCO LLC

CTR PARTNERSHIP LP

DONALDSON, TOMYKA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DWYER, RYAN GLEN

 

Court Documents

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (INSURANCE REQUEST) TO DEF SHEXCO LLC FILED BY PLNTF

07/27/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE (INSURANCE REQUEST) TO DEF SHEXCO LLC FILED BY PLNTF

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (INSURANCE REQUEST) TO DEF SEAWINDS PROPERTIES LLC FILED BY PLNTF

07/27/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE (INSURANCE REQUEST) TO DEF SEAWINDS PROPERTIES LLC FILED BY PLNTF

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (INSURANCE REQUEST) TO DEF NSS-ALF BROOKSVILLE LLC FILED BY PLNTF

07/27/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE (INSURANCE REQUEST) TO DEF NSS-ALF BROOKSVILLE LLC FILED BY PLNTF

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (INSURANCE REQUEST) TO DEF NOBLE DEVELOPMENT AND HOLDING CORP LLC FILED BY PLNTF

07/27/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE (INSURANCE REQUEST) TO DEF NOBLE DEVELOPMENT AND HOLDING CORP LLC FILED BY PLNTF

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (INSURANCE REQUEST) TO DEF TOMYKA DONALDSON FILED BY PLNTF

07/27/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE (INSURANCE REQUEST) TO DEF TOMYKA DONALDSON FILED BY PLNTF

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (INSURANCE REQUEST) TO DEF ASHORE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC FILED BY PLNTF

07/27/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE (INSURANCE REQUEST) TO DEF ASHORE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC FILED BY PLNTF

NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY (FIRST SET) TO DEF SHEXCO LLC FILED BY PLNTF

07/27/2022:NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY (FIRST SET) TO DEF SHEXCO LLC FILED BY PLNTF

NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY (FIRST SET) TO DEF SEAWINDS PROPERTIES LLC FILED BY PLNTF

07/27/2022:NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY (FIRST SET) TO DEF SEAWINDS PROPERTIES LLC FILED BY PLNTF

NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY (FIRST SET) TO DEF NSS-ALF BROOKSVILLE LLC FILED BY PLNTF

07/27/2022:NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY (FIRST SET) TO DEF NSS-ALF BROOKSVILLE LLC FILED BY PLNTF

NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY (FIRST SET) TO DEF NOBLE DEVELOPMENT AND HOLDING CORP LLC FILED BY PLNTF

07/27/2022:NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY (FIRST SET) TO DEF NOBLE DEVELOPMENT AND HOLDING CORP LLC FILED BY PLNTF

NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY (FIRST SET) TO DEF CTR PARTNERSHIP LP FILED BY PLNTF

07/27/2022:NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY (FIRST SET) TO DEF CTR PARTNERSHIP LP FILED BY PLNTF

NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY (FIRST SET) TO DEF ASHORE PROPRTY MANAGEMENT LLC FILED BY PLNTF

07/27/2022:NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY (FIRST SET) TO DEF ASHORE PROPRTY MANAGEMENT LLC FILED BY PLNTF

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (FIRST) TO DEF SHEXCO LLC FILED BY PLNTF

07/27/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE (FIRST) TO DEF SHEXCO LLC FILED BY PLNTF

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (FIRST) TO DEF SEAWINDS PROPERTIES LLC FILED BY PLNTF

07/27/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE (FIRST) TO DEF SEAWINDS PROPERTIES LLC FILED BY PLNTF

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (FIRST) TO DEF NSS-ALF BROOKSVILLE LLC FILED BY PLNTF

07/27/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE (FIRST) TO DEF NSS-ALF BROOKSVILLE LLC FILED BY PLNTF

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (FIRST) TO DEF NOBLE DEVELOPEMENT AND HOLDING CORP LLC FILED BY PLNTF

07/27/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE (FIRST) TO DEF NOBLE DEVELOPEMENT AND HOLDING CORP LLC FILED BY PLNTF

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (FIRST) TO DEF CTR PARTNERSHIP LP FILED BY PLNTF

07/27/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE (FIRST) TO DEF CTR PARTNERSHIP LP FILED BY PLNTF

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (FIRST) TO DEF ASHORE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC FILED BY PLNTF

07/27/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE (FIRST) TO DEF ASHORE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC FILED BY PLNTF

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE (INSURANCE REQUEST) TO DEF SHEXCO LLC FILED BY PLNTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE (INSURANCE REQUEST) TO DEF SEAWINDS PROPERTIES LLC FILED BY PLNTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE (INSURANCE REQUEST) TO DEF NSS-ALF BROOKSVILLE LLC FILED BY PLNTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE (INSURANCE REQUEST) TO DEF NOBLE DEVELOPMENT AND HOLDING CORP LLC FILED BY PLNTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE (INSURANCE REQUEST) TO DEF TOMYKA DONALDSON FILED BY PLNTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE (INSURANCE REQUEST) TO DEF ASHORE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC FILED BY PLNTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY (FIRST SET) TO DEF SHEXCO LLC FILED BY PLNTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY (FIRST SET) TO DEF SEAWINDS PROPERTIES LLC FILED BY PLNTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY (FIRST SET) TO DEF NSS-ALF BROOKSVILLE LLC FILED BY PLNTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY (FIRST SET) TO DEF NOBLE DEVELOPMENT AND HOLDING CORP LLC FILED BY PLNTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ASHORE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, LLC -BLANK-

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED NOBLE DEVELOPMENT AND HOLDING CORP, LLC -BLANK-

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED NSS-ALF BROOKSVILLE, LLC -BLANK-

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR NEGLIGENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $475.00 Receipt Number H 803755

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $475.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $475.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketCase 272022CA000700CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less