This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County on 11/01/2021 at 10:59:53 (UTC).

ESCOBAR, HECTOR VS SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPA

Case Summary

On 03/17/2020 ESCOBAR, HECTOR filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPA. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE, SCAGLIONE, DONALD E and ANGELIADIS, GEORGE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE

SCAGLIONE, DONALD E

ANGELIADIS, GEORGE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESCOBAR, HECTOR

Defendant

SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OVADIA, ABRAHAM

Defendant Attorney

MITCHELL, WILLIAM MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC (FIRST) TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

07/09/2020:REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC (FIRST) TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY (FIRST SET) TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

07/09/2020:NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY (FIRST SET) TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLNTFS COMPLAINT FILED BY DEF

06/18/2020:MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLNTFS COMPLAINT FILED BY DEF

NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FORWARDED BY ELECTRONIC DELIVERY TO SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY ON 052920 (ATTACHED) FILED BY PLNTF

06/12/2020:NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FORWARDED BY ELECTRONIC DELIVERY TO SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY ON 052920 (ATTACHED) FILED BY PLNTF

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF WILLIAM M MITCHELL AS ATTY FOR DEF AND DESIG OF EMAIL ADDRESS wmitchell@conroysimberg.com

06/11/2020:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF WILLIAM M MITCHELL AS ATTY FOR DEF AND DESIG OF EMAIL ADDRESS wmitchell@conroysimberg.com

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED - FORWARDED BY ELECTRONIC DELIVERY TO SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY 052920

06/05/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED - FORWARDED BY ELECTRONIC DELIVERY TO SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY 052920

NOTICE OF SERVICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

03/17/2020:NOTICE OF SERVICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY C/O FLORIDA CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER AS RA ~ BLANK

03/17/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED TO SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY C/O FLORIDA CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER AS RA ~ BLANK

COMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT/INDEBT $53,120.54

03/17/2020:COMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT/INDEBT $53,120.54

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

06/14/2021:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

MOTION FOR ENFORCEMENT OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT -FILED BY DEF

06/10/2021:MOTION FOR ENFORCEMENT OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT -FILED BY DEF

ORDER FILED ON DEFS EMERGENCY MT FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AS TO THE DEPO OF DEFS CORPORATE REP IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART DTD 031221

03/12/2021:ORDER FILED ON DEFS EMERGENCY MT FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AS TO THE DEPO OF DEFS CORPORATE REP IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART DTD 031221

EMERGENCY MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AS TO THE DEPO OF DEF'S CORP REP FILED BY DEF

03/11/2021:EMERGENCY MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AS TO THE DEPO OF DEF'S CORP REP FILED BY DEF

ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER: A-2020-12-I FOURTH AMENDED ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER REGARDING COURT OPERATIONS DUE TO COVID-19 PANDEMIC DATED 9/22/2020

12/09/2020:ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER: A-2020-12-I FOURTH AMENDED ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER REGARDING COURT OPERATIONS DUE TO COVID-19 PANDEMIC DATED 9/22/2020

ADMINISTRATIVE NOTICE

12/09/2020:ADMINISTRATIVE NOTICE

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISS FILED BY DEF

11/19/2020:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISS FILED BY DEF

ORDER FILED (AGREED) ON DEFS MTN FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLNTFS DISCOVERY IS GRANTED - W/I 20 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER DTD 111720

11/17/2020:ORDER FILED (AGREED) ON DEFS MTN FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLNTFS DISCOVERY IS GRANTED - W/I 20 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER DTD 111720

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD FILED BY PLNTF

10/13/2020:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD FILED BY PLNTF

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENFORCEMENT OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT -FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FILED ON DEFS EMERGENCY MT FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AS TO THE DEPO OF DEFS CORPORATE REP IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART DTD 031221

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMERGENCY MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AS TO THE DEPO OF DEF'S CORP REP FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE ON 031221 AT 10:00 VIA ZOOM FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMINISTRATIVE ORDER: A-2020-12-I FOURTH AMENDED ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER REGARDING COURT OPERATIONS DUE TO COVID-19 PANDEMIC DATED 9/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMINISTRATIVE NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketADM ORD-REASSIGN JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number H 675394

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY C/O FLORIDA CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER AS RA ~ BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT/INDEBT $53,120.54

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketCase 272020CA000287CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Security First Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MITCHELL WILLIAM M S