This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County on 11/01/2021 at 13:07:15 (UTC).

EDGEFIELD FLORIDA PROPERTIES L VS HOLLAND, MAURICE

Case Summary

On 05/21/2020 EDGEFIELD FLORIDA PROPERTIES L filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HOLLAND, MAURICE. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are VERGARA, PAMELA STINNETTE, SCAGLIONE, DONALD E and VERGARA, PAMELA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

VERGARA, PAMELA STINNETTE

SCAGLIONE, DONALD E

VERGARA, PAMELA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EDGEFIELD FLORIDA PROPERTIES L

Defendant

HOLLAND, MAURICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SILVER, SCOTT H

 

Court Documents

ADMIN ORDER EST MTN PRACTICE PROCEDURES FOR THE CIVIL JURY AND CIVIL NON JURY DOCKET FOR THE HONORABLE DONALD E SCAGLIONE CIRCUIT CIVIL DIVISION EFFECT 022820 DTD 022820

05/27/2020:ADMIN ORDER EST MTN PRACTICE PROCEDURES FOR THE CIVIL JURY AND CIVIL NON JURY DOCKET FOR THE HONORABLE DONALD E SCAGLIONE CIRCUIT CIVIL DIVISION EFFECT 022820 DTD 022820

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: MAURICE HOLLAND, INMATE #54519-018

05/22/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: MAURICE HOLLAND, INMATE #54519-018

SUMMONS ISSUED TO MAURICE HOLLAND, INMATE # 54519-018

05/21/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED TO MAURICE HOLLAND, INMATE # 54519-018

COVER SHEET

05/21/2020:COVER SHEET

SUPREME COURT OF FLORIDA ADMIN ORDER NO AOSC20-23

05/27/2020:SUPREME COURT OF FLORIDA ADMIN ORDER NO AOSC20-23

ORDER RE COURTESY COPIES TO THE PRESIDING JUDGE DTD 081715

05/27/2020:ORDER RE COURTESY COPIES TO THE PRESIDING JUDGE DTD 081715

COMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT/INDEBT

05/21/2020:COMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT/INDEBT

MTN IN LIMINE PROCEDURE ORDER FOR THE CIVIL JURY AND CIVIL NON JURY DOCKET FOR THE HONORABLE DONALD E SCAGLIONE AND THE HONORABLE GEORGE G ANGELIADIS CIRCUIT CIVIL DIVISION EFFECT 010119 DTD 083018

05/27/2020:MTN IN LIMINE PROCEDURE ORDER FOR THE CIVIL JURY AND CIVIL NON JURY DOCKET FOR THE HONORABLE DONALD E SCAGLIONE AND THE HONORABLE GEORGE G ANGELIADIS CIRCUIT CIVIL DIVISION EFFECT 010119 DTD 083018

ORDER FILED ON PLNTFS MTN FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO SERVE PROCESS ON DEF IS GRANTED AND PLNTF SHALL HAVE AN ADDITIONAL 120 DAYS DTD 091520

09/16/2020:ORDER FILED ON PLNTFS MTN FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO SERVE PROCESS ON DEF IS GRANTED AND PLNTF SHALL HAVE AN ADDITIONAL 120 DAYS DTD 091520

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ORDER ON PLNTFS MTN TO AUTHORIZE PARTITION SALE ON CURRENT OCCUPANTS FILED BY PLNTF

09/03/2021:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ORDER ON PLNTFS MTN TO AUTHORIZE PARTITION SALE ON CURRENT OCCUPANTS FILED BY PLNTF

ORDER FILED ON PLNTFS MTN TO AUTHORITZE PARTITION SALE IS GRANTED DTD 090321

09/03/2021:ORDER FILED ON PLNTFS MTN TO AUTHORITZE PARTITION SALE IS GRANTED DTD 090321

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 090321 AT 10:00 VIA ZOOM ON MTN TO AUTHORIZE PARTITION SALE FILED BY PLNTF

07/27/2021:NOTICE OF HEARING ON 090321 AT 10:00 VIA ZOOM ON MTN TO AUTHORIZE PARTITION SALE FILED BY PLNTF

MOTION FILED TO AUTHORIZE PARTITION SALE -FILED BY PL

06/28/2021:MOTION FILED TO AUTHORIZE PARTITION SALE -FILED BY PL

ORDER FILED (AMENDED) VACATING COURT ORDER OF DEFAULT AS TO DEF MAURICE HOLLAND AND ORDER DENYING PLNTFS MTN FOR DEFAULT AS TO DEF MAURICE HOLLAND W/O PREJ DTD 060121

06/01/2021:ORDER FILED (AMENDED) VACATING COURT ORDER OF DEFAULT AS TO DEF MAURICE HOLLAND AND ORDER DENYING PLNTFS MTN FOR DEFAULT AS TO DEF MAURICE HOLLAND W/O PREJ DTD 060121

ORDER FILED VACATING COURT ORDER OF DEFAULT AS TO DEF MAURICE HOLLAND AND ORDER DENYING PLNTFS MTN FOR DEFAULT AS TO DEF MAURICE HOLLAND - DEF SHALL HAVE 60 DAYS TO FILE ANSWER DTD 051421

05/14/2021:ORDER FILED VACATING COURT ORDER OF DEFAULT AS TO DEF MAURICE HOLLAND AND ORDER DENYING PLNTFS MTN FOR DEFAULT AS TO DEF MAURICE HOLLAND - DEF SHALL HAVE 60 DAYS TO FILE ANSWER DTD 051421

MOTION FILED FOR FJ AFTER DEFAULT FILED BY PLNTF

04/12/2021:MOTION FILED FOR FJ AFTER DEFAULT FILED BY PLNTF

ORDER FILED ON PLNTF'S MOTION FOR COURT DEFAULT AS TO DEF MAURICE HOLLAND=GRANTED DTD 033021

04/01/2021:ORDER FILED ON PLNTF'S MOTION FOR COURT DEFAULT AS TO DEF MAURICE HOLLAND=GRANTED DTD 033021

MOTION FOR DEFAULT (JUDICIAL) AGAINST MAURICE HOLLAND (AMENDED)

03/09/2021:MOTION FOR DEFAULT (JUDICIAL) AGAINST MAURICE HOLLAND (AMENDED)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ORDER ON PLNTFS MTN TO AUTHORIZE PARTITION SALE ON CURRENT OCCUPANTS FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FILED ON PLNTFS MTN TO AUTHORITZE PARTITION SALE IS GRANTED DTD 090321

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ON 090321 AT 10:00 VIA ZOOM ON MTN TO AUTHORIZE PARTITION SALE FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FILED TO AUTHORIZE PARTITION SALE -FILED BY PL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FILED (AMENDED) VACATING COURT ORDER OF DEFAULT AS TO DEF MAURICE HOLLAND AND ORDER DENYING PLNTFS MTN FOR DEFAULT AS TO DEF MAURICE HOLLAND W/O PREJ DTD 060121

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FILED VACATING COURT ORDER OF DEFAULT AS TO DEF MAURICE HOLLAND AND ORDER DENYING PLNTFS MTN FOR DEFAULT AS TO DEF MAURICE HOLLAND - DEF SHALL HAVE 60 DAYS TO FILE ANSWER DTD 051421

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketANSWER TO MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT OF DEFAULT, FILED BY MAURICE HOLLAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FILED FOR FJ AFTER DEFAULT FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FILED ON PLNTF'S MOTION FOR COURT DEFAULT AS TO DEF MAURICE HOLLAND=GRANTED DTD 033021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT (JUDICIAL) AGAINST MAURICE HOLLAND (AMENDED)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMTN IN LIMINE PROCEDURE ORDER FOR THE CIVIL JURY AND CIVIL NON JURY DOCKET FOR THE HONORABLE DONALD E SCAGLIONE AND THE HONORABLE GEORGE G ANGELIADIS CIRCUIT CIVIL DIVISION EFFECT 010119 DTD 083018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: MAURICE HOLLAND, INMATE #54519-018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO MAURICE HOLLAND, INMATE # 54519-018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT/INDEBT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number H 683068

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketCase 272020CA000446CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Silver, Scott H