This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 07/13/2020 at 13:11:24 (UTC).

EATON, GEORGE MANUEL VS EATON, DIANA

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 EATON, GEORGE MANUEL filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against EATON, DIANA. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBEE, DON JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARBEE, DON JR

 

Party Details

Petitioner

EATON, GEORGE MANUEL

Respondent

EATON, DIANA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketORDER FILED DISMISSING CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF INTENT TO ENTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketMEDIATION REPORT-NOT HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketORDER FILED OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION ON 03/03/2020 AT 9 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $120.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $120.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketORDER FILED OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION PROGRAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF - LIMITATION OF SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF CORROBORATING WITNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - HUSBAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS HUSBAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS WIFE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE WIFE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE HUSBAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $408.00 Receipt Number H 659058

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $408.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase 272019DR002448DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/6/2019

    Read MoreRead Less